East Coast Ship Supply et al v. M/V ANGELES IMO No. 9399791
Plaintiff: Wrist North America and East Coast Ship Supply
Defendant: M/V ANGELES IMO No. 9399791
Not Classified By Court: Master of the M/V ANGELES
Case Number: 1:2020cv00617
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
May 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by East Coast Ship Supply, Wrist North America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Notice of Dismissal and Release from Arrest)(Giordano, Phillip)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #13 Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian, #8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #1 Complaint, #12 Warrant Issued, #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian, #7 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem of Service of Process by East Coast Ship Supply, Wrist North America. (Giordano, Phillip)
May 7, 2020 Remark: O'Rourke Investigative Associates has been removed as the custodian and replaced with the Master of the M/V ANGELES per DI #13 - ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Master of the M/V ANGELES appointed. (sam)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appoint Custodian Master of the M/V ANGELES appointed. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 05/07/2020. (sam)
May 7, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 9 has been replaced with a corrected version. Reference to "RJA" in the caption of the motion and proposed order has been removed. These initials were incorrect, and further the case is not assigned and therefore should reflect "UNA." The proposed order has also been corrected to reflect "United States District Judge" underneath the signature line. (nms)
May 7, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (sam)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 Warrant Electronically Issued - Warrant can be printed by Counsel for Use and Service. (sam)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Representative to Serve Vessel with Warrant of Arrest. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 05/07/2020. (sam)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian- O'Rourke Investigative Associates appointed. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 05/07/2020. (sam)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND Motion to Appoint Custodian and Memorandum of Law in Support - filed by East Coast Ship Supply, Wrist North America. (Giordano, Phillip) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/7/2020) (nms). Modified on 5/7/2020 (nms).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 EMERGENCY MOTION to Allow Vessel to Move within Port and Continue Cargo Operations. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 05/07/2020. (sam)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Issuance of a Warrant of Arrest Pursuant to Admiralty Rule C. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 05/07/2020. (sam)
May 7, 2020 Remark: Exit documents to Duty Judge RGA. (sam)
May 7, 2020 No Summons Issued. (sam)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Representative to Serve Vessel with Warrant of Arrest - filed by East Coast Ship Supply, Wrist North America. (sam)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian - filed by East Coast Ship Supply, Wrist North America. (sam)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION to Allow Vessel to Move within Port and Continue Cargo Operations - filed by East Coast Ship Supply, Wrist North America. (sam)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Issuance of a Warrant of Arrest Pursuant to Admiralty Rule C- filed by East Coast Ship Supply, Wrist North America. (sam)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT- filed against M/V ANGELES IMO No. 9399791 - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2920276.) - filed by Wrist North America, East Coast Ship Supply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Verification, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Coast Ship Supply et al v. M/V ANGELES IMO No. 9399791
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ANGELES IMO No. 9399791
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Master of the M/V ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wrist North America
Represented By: William M. Kelleher
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Coast Ship Supply
Represented By: William M. Kelleher
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?