HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc. et al v. Jones
Plaintiff: HOPCo Group Holdings, L.P. and HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Clifford Jones
Case Number: 1:2020cv00627
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Koray J. Bulut, and Hayes P. Hyde for HOPCo Group Holdings, L.P., and for HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Koray J. Bulut and Hayes P. Hyde filed by HOPCo Group Holdings, L.P., HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/15/20. (ntl)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Koray J. Bulut and Hayes P. Hyde - filed by HOPCo Group Holdings, L.P., HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. (Juray, Eric)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed. Waiver sent on 5/14/2020 as to David G. Bray, Esq. on behalf of Clifford Jones, M.D.. (Juray, Eric)
May 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent HOPCo Group Holdings, L.P. for HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc. filed by HOPCo Group Holdings, L.P. and HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc. (nmg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Clifford Jones - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2924098.) - filed by HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc., HOPCo Group Holdings, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc. et al v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPCo Group Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Bruce E. Jameson
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPCo Intermediate Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce E. Jameson
Represented By: Eric Joseph Juray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?