Freddy S.p.A. v. Kalai et al
Plaintiff: Freddy S.p.A.
Defendant: Kalai Phony and Abdeslam Kalai
Case Number: 1:2020cv00628
Filed: May 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason H. Cooper for Freddy S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason H. Cooper filed by Freddy S.p.A. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/4/2020. (dlw)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason H. Cooper - filed by Freddy S.p.A.. (Pazuniak, George)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Freddy S.p.A.. (Pazuniak, George)
May 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg)
May 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
May 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Abdeslam Kalai and Kalai Phony - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2924480.) - filed by Freddy S.p.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freddy S.p.A. v. Kalai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalai Phony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdeslam Kalai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy S.p.A.
Represented By: George Pazuniak
Represented By: Jason H. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?