NexTech Operations, LLC v. Jaffe et al
Plaintiff: NexTech Operations, LLC
Defendant: Marc Jaffe and ComSources LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00640
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 Letter to Judge Leonard P. Stark from Michele Allen regarding Preliminary Injunction - re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Allen, Michele)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ComSources LLC, Marc Jaffe.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Marc Jaffe, #3 Affidavit of Brandon Cockrell, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Herr, Daniel)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Evolution Investments III, LLC, Corporate Parent Evolution Venture Investments LLC for NexTech Operations, LLC filed by NexTech Operations, LLC. (Allen, Michele)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by NexTech Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Certification, #4 Proposed Order)(Allen, Michele)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by ComSources LLC, Marc Jaffe.(Herr, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Charles Herr on behalf of ComSources LLC, Marc Jaffe (Herr, Daniel)
May 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gabrielle A. Giombetti,Christopher P. Stief for NexTech Operations, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher P. Stief filed by NexTech Operations, LLC, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gabrielle A. Giombetti filed by NexTech Operations, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/27/20. (ntl)
May 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NexTech Operations, LLC. ComSources LLC served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Allen, Michele)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits served on Comsources, LLC (through Marc Jaffe) on 5/14/2020, filed by NexTech Operations, LLC. (Allen, Michele)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits served on Marc Jaffe on 5/14/2020, filed by NexTech Operations, LLC. (Allen, Michele)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher P. Stief - filed by NexTech Operations, LLC. (Allen, Michele)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gabrielle A. Giombetti - filed by NexTech Operations, LLC. (Allen, Michele)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against ComSources LLC, Marc Jaffe - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2927602.) - filed by NexTech Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NexTech Operations, LLC v. Jaffe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ComSources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NexTech Operations, LLC
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Represented By: Emily A. Biffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?