Mikkilineni v. PayPal, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maheswar Mikkilineni
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC, Director CfA-CXC Center for Astrophysics/Harvard-Smithsonian, Shijil TS, CEO Sparksupport Infotech Pvt Ltd and PayPal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00647
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Remark: Copy of D.I. #9 has been mailed to the plaintiff. (lih)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter, #6 MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 MOTION to Substitute Party: the United States to replace the Director CfA-CXC Center for Astrophysics/Harvard-Smithsonian. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/21/2020. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/7/2020. (lih)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff REPLY to US Response of June 9, 2020 Opposing Oral-Hearing and Discovery re #6 MOTION for Hearing - filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. (kmd)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Hearing re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Director CfA-CXC Center for Astrophysics/Harvard-Smithsonian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dailey, Derick)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Oral-Hearing and Discovery and Plaintiff Response to US 2nd #1 Notice of Removal - filed by Maheswar Mikkilineni. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(kmd)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/20/2020. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon.(nmf)
May 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Director CfA-CXC Center for Astrophysics/Harvard-Smithsonian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Dailey, Derick)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Party: the United States to replace the Director CfA-CXC Center for Astrophysics/Harvard-Smithsonian - filed by Director CfA-CXC Center for Astrophysics/Harvard-Smithsonian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Dailey, Derick)
May 15, 2020 Remark: Copy of the docket sheet was mailed to the Plaintiff. (mal)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct., Case Number N19C-05-00123 PRW CCLD - filed by Director CfA-CXC Center for Astrophysics/Harvard-Smithsonian.(Filing fee waived)(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikkilineni v. PayPal, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director CfA-CXC Center for Astrophysics/Harvard-Smithsonian
Represented By: Derick D. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shijil TS, CEO Sparksupport Infotech Pvt Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maheswar Mikkilineni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?