Robinson et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Palopoli, Jr., John Toda, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Gini Michelle Cox, Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, Sheila Cauthen, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, David Conroe, Richard Schellhammer, Crystal Robinson, Robert Tyson, Gladys Tubbs, Maxine Glenn, Lana Savage, April Bradley, Kendra Piazza and Tonya Gruchacz
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00663
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy for Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs and Robert Tyson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven R. Weinmann for Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs and Robert Tyson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary S. Graifman, filed by Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Gini Michelle Cox, Tonya Gruchacz, David Conroe, Maxine Glenn, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Sheila Cauthen, Robert Tyson, April Bradley, William Braden, Crystal Robinson, Nicole Blanchard, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Gladys Tubbs, Joseph Palopoli, Jr., Earl Kladke, Katrina Howard, and #28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa R. Emert, filed by Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Gini Michelle Cox, Tonya Gruchacz, David Conroe, Maxine Glenn, John Toda, Richard Schellhammer, Sheila Cauthen, Robert Tyson, April Bradley, William Braden, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Nicole Blanchard, Crystal Robinson, Gladys Tubbs, Joseph Palopoli, Jr., Earl Kladke, Katrina Howard. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/8/2020. (nms)
July 7, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa R. Emert - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
July 7, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary S. Graifman - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
July 6, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy for General Motors LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven R. Weinmann, filed by Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Gini Michelle Cox, Tonya Gruchacz, David Conroe, Maxine Glenn, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Sheila Cauthen, Robert Tyson, April Bradley, William Braden, Crystal Robinson, Nicole Blanchard, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Gladys Tubbs, Joseph Palopoli, Jr., Earl Kladke, Katrina Howard, and #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy, filed by Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Gini Michelle Cox, Tonya Gruchacz, David Conroe, Maxine Glenn, John Toda, Richard Schellhammer, Sheila Cauthen, Robert Tyson, April Bradley, William Braden, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Nicole Blanchard, Crystal Robinson, Gladys Tubbs, Joseph Palopoli, Jr., Earl Kladke, Katrina Howard. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/2/2020. (nms)
July 2, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
July 2, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven R. Weinmann - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SO ORDERED, re #23 Stipulation and Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/23/2020. (nms) (nms).
June 22, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing by General Motors LLC. (Sensing, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC for General Motors LLC filed by General Motors LLC. (Sensing, John)
June 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Allyson McKinstry for General Motors LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
June 12, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amey J. Park for Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs and Robert Tyson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
June 12, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rosanne L. Mah for Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
June 12, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rosemary M. Rivas for Nicole Blanchard, for William Braden, for April Bradley, for Sheila Cauthen,for David Conroe, for Gini Michelle Cox, for Maxine Glenn, for Tonya Gruchacz,for Katrina Howard, for Earl Kladke, for Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, for Joseph Palopoli, Jr, for Kendra Piazza, for Crystal Robinson,for Lana Savage, for Richard Schellhammer, for John Toda, for Gladys Tubbs, for Robert Tyson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Robinson, #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gayle M. Blatt, #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patricia Camille Guerra, and #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James M. Davis, all filed by Sheila Cauthen, William Braden, Gini Michelle Cox, April Bradley, David Conroe, Maxine Glenn, Nicole Blanchard. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2020. (nms)
June 11, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James M. Davis - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn. (Paul, Russell)
June 11, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gayle M. Blatt - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn. (Paul, Russell)
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Robinson - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn. (Paul, Russell)
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patricia Camille Guerra - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn. (Paul, Russell)
June 11, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher D. Moon for Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, and Robert Tyson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allyson McKinstry, filed by General Motors LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/8/2020. (nms)
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allyson McKinstry - filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Adnitted Pro Hac Vice)(Sensing, John)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allyson McKinstry (D.I. #14 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. The motion is dated for and was filed on June 5, 2020, yet the certification by counsel indicates a signing date of June 6, 2020. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/8/2020. (nms)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy, filed by General Motors LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/8/2020. (nms)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allyson McKinstry - filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Sensing, John) Modified on 6/8/2020 (nms).
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy - filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Sensing, John) Modified on 6/8/2020 (nms).
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarissa Rae Chenoweth-Shook on behalf of General Motors LLC (Chenoweth-Shook, Clarissa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anderson Sensing on behalf of General Motors LLC (Sensing, John)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Furey McDonough on behalf of General Motors LLC (McDonough, Kathleen)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Gini Michelle Cox, Gladys Tubbs, Earl Kladke, Maxine Glenn, Crystal Robinson, April Bradley, Tonya Gruchacz, Sheila Cauthen, Katrina Howard, Robert Tyson, Richard Schellhammer, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, John Toda, David Conroe, Nicole Blanchard, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, William Braden: For General Motors LLC waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Paul, Russell)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher D. Moon, #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rosanne L. Mah, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amey J. Park, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keven O. Moon, and #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rosemary M. Rivas. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/20/2020. (nms)
May 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rosanne L. Mah - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rosemary M. Rivas - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher D. Moon - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keven O. Moon - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amey J. Park - filed by Nicole Blanchard, William Braden, April Bradley, Sheila Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Maxine Glenn, Tonya Gruchacz, Katrina Howard, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, Kendra Piazza, Crystal Robinson, Lana Savage, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Gladys Tubbs, Robert Tyson. (Paul, Russell)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2934139.) - filed by Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Gini Michelle Cox, Gladys Tubbs, Earl Kladke, Maxine Glenn, Crystal Robinson, April Bradley, Tonya Gruchacz, Sheila Cauthen, Katrina Howard, Robert Tyson, Richard Schellhammer, Joseph Palopoli, Jr, John Toda, David Conroe, Nicole Blanchard, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, William Braden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Palopoli, Jr.
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Toda
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gini Michelle Cox
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Blanchard
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Braden
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Cauthen
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Howard
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Kladke
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Conroe
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schellhammer
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Robinson
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tyson
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Tubbs
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Glenn
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Savage
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Bradley
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Piazza
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Gruchacz
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Christopher D. Moon
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: Kathleen Furey McDonough
Represented By: Allyson McKinstry
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Clarissa Rae Chenoweth-Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?