Davis-Collins v. City of Wilmington et al
Plaintiff: Leonette Davis-Collins
Defendant: Jennifer Prado, City of Wilmington, Keith Brooks, Charlotte Barnes, Chief Robert J. Tracy, Sheila Martin and Tanya Washington
Case Number: 1:2020cv00758
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Leonette Davis-Collins: For Charlotte Barnes waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; City of Wilmington waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Sheila Martin waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Jennifer Prado waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Robert J. Tracy waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Tanya Washington waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Allen, Michele)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Najemy on behalf of Charlotte Barnes, City of Wilmington, Sheila Martin, Jennifer Prado, Robert J. Tracy, Tanya Washington (Najemy, Laura)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonette Davis-Collins. Keith Brooks served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Allen, Michele)
July 17, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Keith Brooks on 7/17/2020. (kmd)
June 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 5, 2020 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Charlotte Barnes, Keith Brooks, City of Wilmington, Sheila Martin, Jennifer Prado, Robert J. Tracy, Tanya Washington - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2975942.) - filed by Leonette Davis-Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis-Collins v. City of Wilmington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Prado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wilmington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Robert J. Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonette Davis-Collins
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Represented By: Emily A. Biffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?