In Re: Energy Future Holdings Corp., et al
Debtor: Energy Future Holdings Corp., et al.
Appellee: Energy Future Holdings Corp.
Appellant: Alvester Coleman
Case Number: 1:2020cv00802
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Orders (D.I. #8 and D.I. #9 ) by Energy Future Holdings Corp.. (Madron, Jason) Modified on 7/30/2020 (nms).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2020. (nms)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge's recommendation (D.I. #5 ) is accepted, the objection (D.I. #7 ) is overruled, and the appeal is withdrawn from mediation. There is no abuse of discretion in the Magistrate Judge's statement as they why mediation is not warranted. A separate briefing schedule will be set. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2020. (nms)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #5 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation, by Alvester Coleman. (kmd) Modified on 6/30/2020 (nms).
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 Counter-Designation of Items to be Included on the Record on Appeal, filed by Energy Future Holdings Corp., et al.. (Madron, Jason) Modified on 6/29/2020 (nms).
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/23/20. (cak)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2020. (nms)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Alvester Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(amf).
June 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam)
June 12, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. Designated Record on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (sam) Modified on 6/17/2020 (nms).
June 12, 2020 No Designation of Record Filed. (sam) Modified on 6/17/2020 (nms).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF Appeal; Appealing the Order entered on 6/01/2020, by Judge Christopher S. Sontchi in Bankruptcy Case Number 14-10979(CSS). *Fee Status not Paid - filed by Alvester Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(sam) Modified on 6/17/2020 (nms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Energy Future Holdings Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Energy Future Holdings Corp., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Energy Future Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Mark David Collins
Represented By: Zachary I. Shapiro
Represented By: Thomas Michael Horan
Represented By: David M. Klauder
Represented By: Jason Michael Madron
Represented By: Christopher Michael De Lillo
Represented By: Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Represented By: Joseph Charles Barsalona, II
Represented By: Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alvester Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?