Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al v. Actavis LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sanofi Mature IP and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd., Belcher Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Actavis LLC, Apotex Inc., Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, BPI Labs, LLC, Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Apotex Corp., Hetero USA, Inc., MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Accord Healthcare Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited and MSN Laboratories Private Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00804
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 10, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fresenius Kabi USA, LLCs Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) filed by Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 10, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.s Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 10, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
August 10, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan Laboratories Limited's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Palapura, Bindu)
August 10, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Apotex Inc.'s and Apotex Corp.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Haney, Megan)
August 10, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Actavis LLCs Initial Disclosures filed by Actavis LLC.(Keller, Karen)
August 10, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
August 7, 2020 Filing 69 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 8/7/2020 (nms).
August 5, 2020 Filing 68 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint (see 20-761-RGA), Separate Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, by Mylan Laboratories Limited.(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 8/5/2020 (nms).
August 5, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00761-RGA, 1:20-cv-00803-RGA, 1:20-cv-00804-RGA(cak)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORAL ORDER: The Rule 16(b) Conference set for 8/7/2020, is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00646-RGA, 1:20-cv-00761-RGA, 1:20-cv-00803-RGA, 1:20-cv-00804-RGA(nms)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to a Magistrate Judge to handle all discovery disputes including any that arise in connection with expert reports. These actions are consolidated for all purposes and all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 20-804-RGA. Joinder of Parties due by 12/11/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2020. Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 11/25/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 12/17/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 5/14/2021, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3 day ench Trial is set to start 5/24/2021, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00646-RGA, 1:20-cv-00761-RGA, 1:20-cv-00803-RGA, 1:20-cv-00804-RGA(nms) Modified on 8/5/2020 (nms).
August 5, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tiffany Mahmood for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 5, 2020 Filing 65 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 8/5/2020 (nms).
August 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Andrew M. Alul and Roshan P. Shrestha for Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 4, 2020 Filing 64 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding dial-in information for the August 7, 2020 scheduling teleconference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 31, 2020 Filing 63 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,716,777 . (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 31, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys William E. Solander and Daniel J. Minion for Sanofi Mature IP and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00646-RGA, 1:20-cv-00761-RGA, 1:20-cv-00803-RGA, 1:20-cv-00804-RGA(kmd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 62 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Sandoz Inc.- filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 31, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daryl L. Wiesen for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SO ORDERED Granting #60 Proposed Dismissal Order as to BPI (*Party BPI Labs, LLC and Belcher Pharmaceuticals, LLC terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/30/2020. (nms)
July 30, 2020 Filing 60 PROPOSED Dismissal Order as to BPI, by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/30/2020 (nms).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SO ORDERED Granting #58 Proposed Dismissal Order as to Hetero (*Party Hetero USA, Inc., Hetero Labs Ltd. and Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/30/2020. (nms)
July 29, 2020 Filing 58 PROPOSED Dismissal Order as to Hetero, by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/30/2020 (nms).
July 29, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aviv A. Zalcenstein for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 27, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Frank D. Rodriguez and James P. Barabas for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 27, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joel L. Broussard for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emily L. Rapalino for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daryl L. Wiesen, Emily L. Rapalino Tiffany Mahmood, Aviv A. Zalcenstein and Joel L. Broussard, filed by Sandoz Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/23/2020. (nms)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank D. Rodriguez and James P. Barabas, filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/23/2020. (nms)
July 23, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daryl L. Wiesen, Emily L. Rapalino Tiffany Mahmood, Aviv A. Zalcenstein and Joel L. Broussard - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
July 23, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank D. Rodriguez and James P. Barabas - filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
July 22, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Derek B. Lavender for Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Derek B. Lavender, filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2020. (nms)
July 21, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Derek B. Lavender - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Derek B. Lavender)(Haney, Megan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew M. Alul and Roshan P. Shrestha, Ph.D., filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2020. (nms)
July 21, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew M. Alul and Roshan P. Shrestha, Ph.D. - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Andrew M. Alul, #2 Certification of Roshan P. Shrestha, Ph.D.)(Haney, Megan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complain (*Reset Answer Deadlines: BPI Labs, LLC answer due 8/3/2020; Belcher Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 8/3/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2020. (nms)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SO ORDERED Granting #38 Stipulation and Order (*Party Actavis Elizabeth LLC terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2020. (nms)
July 20, 2020 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fresenius Kabi Pharmaceuticals Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Fresenius Kabi AG for Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC filed by Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC. (Gattuso, Dominick)
July 20, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs, by Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 7/21/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Novartis AG for Sandoz Inc. filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
July 20, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses, and Counterclaims against All Plaintiffs, by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 7/21/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C. Haney on behalf of Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. (Haney, Megan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 47 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aposherm Delaware Holdings Corporation for Apotex Corp.; Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc. for Apotex Inc. filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Phillips, John)
July 20, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs, by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Phillips, John) Modified on 7/21/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Filing 45 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Towa Pharma International Holdings S.L for Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
July 20, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The disclosure statement filed at D.I. 45 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. The correct disclosure statement will be refiled. (nms)
July 20, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIMS against Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 7/20/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Corporate Parent Dr. Reddy's Laboratories SA for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
July 20, 2020 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint - filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/21/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. for Actavis LLC filed by Actavis LLC. (Keller, Karen)
July 20, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIMS against Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve) Modified on 7/20/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIMS against Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, by Actavis LLC.(Keller, Karen) Modified on 7/21/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION and Proposed Order, by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC. (Keller, Karen) Modified on 7/20/2020 (nms).
July 20, 2020 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hetero Drugs Limited, Corporate Parent Hetero Labs Limited for Hetero USA, Inc. filed by Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI, Hetero USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 20, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI, Hetero USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 10, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Sarita M. Matheson and Todd S. Werner for Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI, Hetero USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SO ORDERED, re #34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarita M. Matheson and Attorney Todd S. Werner, filed by Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI, Hetero USA, Inc., Hetero Labs Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/8/2020. (nms)
July 8, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarita M. Matheson and Attorney Todd S. Werner - filed by Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI, Hetero USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys C. Kyle Musgrove, Elizabeth M. Crompton, John W. Bateman for Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/7/2020, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/6/2020. (nms)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Kyle Musgrove, Elizabeth M. Crompton and John W. Bateman, filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/6/2020. (nms)
July 6, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Kyle Musgrove, Elizabeth M. Crompton and John W. Bateman - filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to July 20, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. answer due 7/20/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/6/2020. (nms)
July 2, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to July 20, 2020 - filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 30, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael S. Scerbo for Sanofi Mature IP and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00646-RGA, 1:20-cv-00761-RGA, 1:20-cv-00803-RGA, 1:20-cv-00804-RGA(mal)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to July 20, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. answer due 7/20/2020; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. answer due 7/20/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/30/2020. (nms)
June 30, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to July 20, 2020 - filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 6/30/2020 (nms).
June 29, 2020 Filing 29 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for an early Rule 16 conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #28 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Actavis Elizabeth LLC answer due 7/20/2020; Actavis LLC answer due 7/20/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2020. (nms)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 20, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC answer due 7/20/2020; Sandoz Inc. answer due 7/20/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2020. (nms)
June 26, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to July 20, 2020 - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC. (Shaw, John)
June 26, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 20, 2020 - filed by Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Sandoz Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
June 26, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Sandoz Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: BPI Labs, LLC answer due 7/20/2020; Belcher Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 7/20/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2020. (nms)
June 26, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time - filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/26/2020 (nms).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (10 in 20-cv-761-RGA; 11 in 20-cv-46-RGA; 9 in 20-cv-803-RGA; 24 in 20-cv-804-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jiang Lin, filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00646-RGA, 1:20-cv-00761-RGA, 1:20-cv-00803-RGA, 1:20-cv-00804-RGA(nms)
June 25, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Whitney L. Meier for Sanofi Mature IP,for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 24, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jiang Lin - filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Fahnestock, Derek)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (9 in 20-cv-761-RGA; 8 in 20-cv-803-RGA; 10 in 20-cv-646-RGA; 23 in 20-cv-804-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William E. Solander, Daniel J. Minion, Whitney L. Meier and Michael S. Scerbo, filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00646-RGA, 1:20-cv-00761-RGA, 1:20-cv-00803-RGA, 1:20-cv-00804-RGA(nms)
June 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William E. Solander, Daniel J. Minion, Whitney L. Meier and Michael S. Scerbo - filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Fahnestock, Derek)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SO ORDERED Granting #20 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to Glenmark (*Party Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/22/2020. (nms)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Hetero Labs Ltd. answer due 7/20/2020; Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI answer due 7/20/2020; Hetero USA, Inc. answer due 7/20/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/22/2020. (nms)
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time - filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/19/2020 (nms).
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal as to Glenmark, by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 6/19/2020 (nms).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Apotex to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 20, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Apotex Corp. answer due 7/20/2020; Apotex Inc. answer due 7/20/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/19/2020. (nms)
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Apotex to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to July 20, 2020 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Phillips, John) Modified on 6/19/2020 (nms).
June 19, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. Apotex Inc. served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Fahnestock, Derek)
June 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00803-RGA, 1:20-cv-00804-RGA (rjb)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Related Papers served on Sandoz Inc. on June 16, 2020, filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Fahnestock, Derek)
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Related Papers served on Belcher Pharmaceuticals, LLC on June 16, 2020, filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Fahnestock, Derek)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Related Papers served on Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc. on June 16, 2020, filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Fahnestock, Derek)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Related Papers served on BPI Labs, LLC on June 16, 2020, filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Fahnestock, Derek)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. Hetero USA, Inc. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. Apotex Corp. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. Actavis LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. Actavis Elizabeth LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by Sanofi Mature IP, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (myr)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,583,110 B2. (myr)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: Not Applicable. Date of Expiration of Patent: October 27, 2030. Thirty Month Stay Deadline:Not Applicable (myr)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC, Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., BPI Labs, LLC, Belcher Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI, Hetero USA, Inc., Sandoz Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2991969.) - filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Mature IP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al v. Actavis LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd.
Represented By: Sarita M. Matheson
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belcher Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: Andrew M. Alul
Represented By: Roshan P. Shrestha
Represented By: Derek B. Lavender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-VI
Represented By: Sarita M. Matheson
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Frank D. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPI Labs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Frank D. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Mahmood
Represented By: Aviv A. Zalcenstein
Represented By: Joel L. Broussard
Represented By: Daryl L. Wiesen
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Emily L. Rapalino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Crompton
Represented By: John W. Bateman
Represented By: C. Kyle Musgrove
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: Andrew M. Alul
Represented By: Roshan P. Shrestha
Represented By: Derek B. Lavender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sarita M. Matheson
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Limited
Represented By: Matthew R. Reed
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Edward Powell, III
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: Kristina M. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Laboratories Private Ltd.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanofi Mature IP
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: William E. Solander
Represented By: Michael S. Scerbo
Represented By: Daniel J. Minion
Represented By: Whitney L. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: William E. Solander
Represented By: Michael S. Scerbo
Represented By: Daniel J. Minion
Represented By: Whitney L. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?