Altaba, Inc. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Altaba, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America
Claimant: California Franchise Tax Board, Droplets Inc., Oath Holdings Inc. and Verizon Communications Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00813
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Armando Gomez for Altaba, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David W. Foster for Altaba, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Altaba's and the United States of America's Joint Motion to Continue Hearing (D.I. 32), which is not opposed by Verizon (D.I. 33), is GRANTED. Altaba, USA, and Verizon shall meet and confer and, no later than August 21, submit a joint status report, including their proposal(s) for how this case should proceed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/13/20. (ntl)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David W. Foster filed by Altaba, Inc., #30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Armando Gomez filed by Altaba, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/13/20. (ntl)
August 12, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Currently Scheduled for August 13, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. filed by Oath Holdings Inc., Verizon Communications Inc.. (Pittenger, Michael)
August 12, 2020 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Currently Scheduled for August 13, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donohue, Dennis)
August 12, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David W. Foster - filed by Altaba, Inc.. (Lockwood, Paul)
August 12, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Armando Gomez - filed by Altaba, Inc.. (Lockwood, Paul)
August 11, 2020 Filing 29 Letter to Court of Chancery from Clerk USDC/DE regarding partial remand. (ntl)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #6 Joint MOTION to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery filed by Altaba, Inc. is GRANTED in part as to the uncontested portions of the motion; A Telephone Conference is set for 8/13/2020 at 10:30 AM to hear argument on the contested portions of the motion. Counsel and any interested member of the public shall use the following call-in information: (877) 336-1829 and access code 1408971. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/10/20. (Attachment: #1 Letter) (ntl)
July 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Petitioner Altaba, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to the California Franchise Tax Board, Petitioner Altaba, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories Directed to the California Franchise Tax Board, Petitioner Altaba, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Verizon Communications Inc., Petitioner Altaba, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Verizon Communications Inc., Petitioner Altaba, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Droplets, Inc. and Petitioner Altaba, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Droplets, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Altaba, Inc..(Lockwood, Paul)
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from A. Thompson Bayliss, Esq. regarding the California Franchise Tax Board's position on the Motion to Sever and Remand - re #6 Joint MOTION to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery, #20 Response to Motion. (Bayliss, A.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Joint MOTION to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery filed by United States of America. (Donohue, Dennis)
July 20, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Joint MOTION to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery filed by Altaba, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Reply)(Lockwood, Paul)
July 16, 2020 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Verizon Communications Inc.. (Pittenger, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Oath Holdings Inc. filed by Oath Holdings Inc.. (Pittenger, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 JOINDER by Droplets Inc., joining in #6 Motion to Sever, In Altaba, Inc.'s and The United States of America's Joint Motion to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery. (Manwaring, Albert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Joint MOTION to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery filed by Oath Holdings Inc., Verizon Communications Inc.. (Pittenger, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Seal on behalf of Oath Holdings Inc., Verizon Communications Inc. (Pittenger, Michael) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ntl).
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Berton W. Ashman, Jr. on behalf of Oath Holdings Inc., Verizon Communications Inc. (Pittenger, Michael) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ntl).
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Pittenger on behalf of Oath Holdings Inc., Verizon Communications Inc. (Pittenger, Michael)
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Ann Zeberkiewicz on behalf of Droplets Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zeberkiewicz, Kirsten)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 STATEMENT Responding to Notice and Order Regarding Proceedings Pursuant to Section 280 of the Delaware General Corporation Law and Right to Appear by Droplets Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Manwaring, Albert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert H. Manwaring, IV on behalf of Droplets Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Manwaring, Albert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT of Claimant California Franchise Tax Board by California Franchise Tax Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bayliss, A.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Paul J. Lockwood, Esq. regarding in response to Verizon Communication Inc. and Oath Holding, Inc.s (together, Verizon) letter dated today - re #10 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Chancery Court Docket)(Lockwood, Paul)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT re #10 Letter, #1 Notice of Removal Statement of Claimants by Verizon Communications Inc., Oath Holdings Inc.. (Pittenger, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael A. Pittenger on behalf of Verizon Communications Inc. and Oath Holdings Inc. regarding the Joint Motion to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Court of Chancery - re #6 Joint MOTION to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery. (Pittenger, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and the Notice filed in the Delaware Court of Chancery by United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal (Donohue, Dennis)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 2- Verification to Verified Petition for Determinations, #2 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 3- Supplemental Information Sheet, #3 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 4- Exhibits 1-23 to Verified Petition for Determinations, #4 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 5- Exhibits 24-25 to Verified Petition for Determinations, #5 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 6- Exhibits 26-35 to Verified Petition for Determinations, #6 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 8- Exhibits 38-40 to Verified Petition for Determinations, #7 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 9- Letter to the Register in Chancery, #8 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 10- Motion for Entry of an Order, #9 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 11- Proposed Order Granting Motion for Entry of an Order, #10 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 12- Exhibit A to Motion for Entry of an Order, #11 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 13- Exhibit B to Motion for Entry of an Order, #12 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 14- Letter Enclosing two Courtesy Copies, #13 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 15- Order Granting Motion for Entry of an Order, #14 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 16- Declaration of Mailing, #15 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 17- Declaration of Electronic Mailing, #16 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 18- Exhibits 1-2 to Declaration of Mailing, #17 Chancery Court Dkt. No. 19- Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Electronic Mailing)(Donohue, Dennis)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Letter to Kenneth J. Lagowski from John A. Cerino regarding [Proposed] Clerk of District Court Letter to Chancery Court re Remand - re #6 Joint MOTION to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery. (Lockwood, Paul)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery - filed by Altaba, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Altaba Inc.'s and the United States of America's Joint Motion to Sever and Remand Certain Claims to the Delaware Court of Chancery)(Lockwood, Paul)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Altaba, Inc. by United States of America.(Donohue, Dennis)
June 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00811-LPS, 1:20-cv-00813-LPS (rjb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Claims Raised By Claimant the California Franchise Tax Board by California Franchise Tax Board. (Bayliss, A.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Thompson Bayliss on behalf of California Franchise Tax Board (Bayliss, A.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Court, Case Number 2020-0413-JTL (Filing fee waived) - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altaba, Inc. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altaba, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Lockwood
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Arthur R. Bookout
Represented By: Armando Gomez
Represented By: David W. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Catriona M. Coppler
Represented By: Dennis Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: California Franchise Tax Board
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Droplets Inc.
Represented By: Albert H. Manwaring, IV
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Zeberkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Oath Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: David Alden Seal
Represented By: Berton William Ashman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Verizon Communications Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Pittenger
Represented By: David Alden Seal
Represented By: Berton William Ashman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?