Bristol-Myers Squibb Company v. Lupin Limited et al
Plaintiff: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Defendant: Lupin Limited, Lupin Inc. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00854
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 9/30/2020 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Inc. answer due 9/30/2020; Lupin Limited answer due 9/30/2020; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/7/2020. (fms)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 9/30/2020 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Farnan, Brian)
July 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,491,725 B2 ;US 8,680,103 B2. (mal)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: May 15, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/15/2022. (mal)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Lupin Inc., Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3019225.) - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company v. Lupin Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?