Groupo Piraino, LLC v. Wargo
Plaintiff: Groupo Piraino, LLC
Defendant: Kevin M. Wargo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00855
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED re #9 Stipulation of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/23/2020. (dlw)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Groupo Piraino, LLC. (Brown, Amy)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to object or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Notice of Confession of Judgment to July 24, 2020 - filed by Kevin M. Wargo. (Sensing, John)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarissa Rae Chenoweth-Shook on behalf of Kevin M. Wargo (Chenoweth-Shook, Clarissa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anderson Sensing on behalf of Kevin M. Wargo (Sensing, John)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to object or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Notice of Confession of Judgment to July 24, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/16/2020. (dlw)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice Letter of Entry of Judgment served on Kevin M. Wargo on June 30, 2020, filed by Groupo Piraino, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Amy)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary P. Lightman, Esq., #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Glenn A. Manochi, Esq. filed by Groupo Piraino, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/2/2020. (dlw)
July 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary P. Lightman, Esq. - filed by Groupo Piraino, LLC. (Gellert, Ronald)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Glenn A. Manochi, Esq. - filed by Groupo Piraino, LLC. (Gellert, Ronald)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Kevin M. Wargo from Groupo Piraino, LLC regarding Entry of Judgment - re #1 . (nmg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Confession of Judgment pursuant to D.Del LR 58.1.1 by Groupo Piraino, LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3021286) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Statement of Jurisdiction and Venue, #3 Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groupo Piraino, LLC v. Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groupo Piraino, LLC
Represented By: Amy D. Brown
Represented By: Ronald S. Gellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. Wargo
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: Clarissa Rae Chenoweth-Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?