WINTERS et al v. AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KETURAH WINTERS and ERIC WINTERS
Defendant: BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, HIGH-TECH PACKING & CRATING, INC., BDP International Inc., WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES, ABC Corporations 1-10 and John Does #1-10
3Rd Party Defendant: GREIF PACKAGING, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SPRAY-TEK, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00856
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 82 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/27/2020. (lak)
June 26, 2020 Filing 81 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 5:19-cv-05398. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 25, 2020 Filing 80 GREIF PACKAGING LLC ANSWER to #73 Third Party Complaint FIRST AMENDED OF SPRAY-TEK LLC, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GREIF PACKAGING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NOFER, FRANK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 79 STIPULATION TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by GREIF PACKAGING, LLC. (NOFER, FRANK) Modified on 6/25/2020 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 78 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED against SPRAY-TEK, LLC, filed by SPRAY-TEK, LLC.(ROUTANEN, LEANNA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 77 ANSWER to #71 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, and Affirmative Defenses by WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES.(STRUWE, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GREIF PACKAGING, LLC.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo of Law, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(NOFER, FRANK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 75 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GREIF PACKAGING, LLC.(NOFER, FRANK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK S. NOFER on behalf of GREIF PACKAGING, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(NOFER, FRANK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 73 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against GREIF PACKAGING, LLC, filed by SPRAY-TEK, LLC.(ROUTANEN, LEANNA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 72 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint, by BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS.(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 71 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint together with WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CROSS CLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT , CROSSCLAIM against BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, HIGH-TECH PACKING & CRATING, INC., HIGH-TECH PACKING & CRATING, INC., WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES by SPRAY-TEK, LLC.(DEASEY, FRANCIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF 5/26/20 THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR A MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IS GRANTED FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION; AND ALL CLAIMS IN THIS MATTER ASSERTED AGAINST DEFENDANT BILL TIMPANO ARE HEREBY TRANSFERRED TO THE U.S.D.C. EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/26/20. 5/26/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/26/20. 5/26/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/26/20. 5/26/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY) Modified on 5/26/2020 (dt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 68 Defendant Spray-Tek, LLC's ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC., BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, HIGH-TECH PACKING & CRATING, INC., BILL TAMPANO, WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES by SPRAY-TEK, LLC.(DEASEY, FRANCIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER OF 5/12/20 THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (DOC. NO. 30) IS DENIED. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/12/20. 5/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION OF 5/12/20.. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/12/20. 5/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt) Modified on 5/13/2020 (dt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE:A status call is scheduled on July 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call to chambers (267-299-7410) once all defense counsel are on the line or if counsel prefers to provide a call-in number that is fine as well.(smcc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET Pretrial Conference held on 5/12/20 (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. Telephone Conference was held on 5/6/20 and not placed on the record. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER OF 5/7/20 THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE HELD WITH ALL COUNSEL, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 30, 2020. A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON JULY 10, 2020 AT 10:00AM. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THE CALL. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/7/20. 5/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John L. Hudak re: served Amended Complaint Defendant High Tech upon Domenic McKamon by Personal on 04/30/2020 (ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. FITZMAURICE on behalf of BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS with JURY DEMAND(FITZMAURICE, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. FITZMAURICE on behalf of BILL TAMPANO with Jury Demand(FITZMAURICE, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint, by BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC..(RAU, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 4/28/20 THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH SPRAY-TEK, LLC MUST RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TWENTY (20) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS STIPULATION. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/28/20. 4/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 56 STIPULATION of Counsel - 20 Day Extension to Answer Amended Complaint by SPRAY-TEK, LLC. (DEASEY, FRANCIS) Modified on 4/29/2020 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF 4/27/20 THAT NOURYON SC'S FIRST MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (ECF NO. 20), IS DENIED AS MOOT. NOURYON SC'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (ECF NO 23) IS GRANTED FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION, AND ALL CLAIMS IN THIS MATTER ASSERTED AGAINST DEFENDANT NOURYON SC ARE HEREBY TRANSFERRED TO THE U.S.D.C. DISTRICT OF DELAWARE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/27/20. 4/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP)(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION OF 4/27/20. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/27/20. 4/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP)(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by LEANNA BROOKE ROUTANEN on behalf of SPRAY-TEK, LLC with Certifcate of Service(ROUTANEN, LEANNA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) filed by BILL TAMPANO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS J. DEASEY on behalf of SPRAY-TEK, LLC with Jury Demand and Cert. of Service(DEASEY, FRANCIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) filed by ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE: The settlement conference scheduled on April 15, 2020 at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge and the status telephone call scheduled on April 8, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. are both CANCELED. There is a status call scheduled on May 12, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call to chambers (267-299-7410) once all defense counsel are on the line.(smcc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Pennsylvania filed by ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS. (BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) filed by BILL TAMPANO.Memorandum, Exhibit/Affidavit, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF 4/23/20 THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT, BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC, FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED; THIS HONORABLE COURT EXTENDS THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT, BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC, TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO APRIL 30, 2020. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/2/20. 4/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY) Modified on 4/3/2020 (dt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(RAU, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 42 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC..(RAU, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC. (RAU, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC.(GRANEK, ELIEZER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC. (GRANEK, ELIEZER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Pennsylvania filed by BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Pennsylvania filed by WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(SHAPIRO, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Pennsylvania filed by AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 35 PRAECIPE TO SUBSTITUTE EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANT BACARELLA TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC. D/B/A BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BACARELLA TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC. D/B/A BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Strike #22 Amended Complaint, filed by WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES. (SHAPIRO, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF 3/24/20 THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 31, 2020 IS RESCHEDULED TO MAY 6, 2020 AT 2:30PM IN THE READING, PA., CHAMBERS. THIS CONFERENCE WILL BE AN IN-PERSON CONFERENCE. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/24/20. 3/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Strike #22 Amended Complaint, filed by ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS.Memorandum, Exhibit/Affidavit, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Strike #22 Amended Complaint, filed by WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(SHAPIRO, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 27 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Pennsylvania filed by ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS.Motion, Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(HOWELL, JORDAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Court House Legal re: served Amended Complaint upon Rachel Jacobson by Personal on 03/12/2020 (ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Court House Legal re: served Amended Complaint upon Michael Cavender by Personal on 03/12/2020 (ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 11, 2020 4 ALIAS Summons Issued as to BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC., BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, HIGH-TECH PACKING & CRATING, INC., SPRAY-TEK, LLC. GIVEN To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ROBERT ZIMMERMAN on 3/11/2020 (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 24 Issue Summons by ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS. (ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Service)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 3, 2020 4 Summons Issued as to BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC., BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, HIGH-TECH PACKING & CRATING, INC., SPRAY-TEK, LLC. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, LARRY BENDESKY on 3/4/2020 (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC, BDP INTERNATIONAL, INC., BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS, HIGH-TECH PACKING & CRATING, INC., JOHN DOES 1-10, SPRAY-TEK, LLC, BILL TAMPANO, WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES, filed by ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by ALBERT G. BIXLER on behalf of AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC with Certificate of Service(BIXLER, ALBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 19 Disclosure by All Plaintiffs.(ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing:A settlement conference will be held on April 15, 2020 at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge. Please report to the James A. Byrne U.S. Courthouse, 601 Market Street, Room 4006 (Chambers), Philadelphia, PA 19106 for the assigned courtroom. A status telephone call will be held one week before on April 8, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call to chambers (267-299-7410) once all defense counsel are on the line.(smcc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT, APPEARING THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY RICE HAS RECUSED HIMSELF, THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THIS MATTER IS NO LONGER REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY RICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/4/20. 2/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC on 12/19/19 answer due 2/18/20 by ERIC WINTERS. (HOWELL, JORDAN) Modified on 2/18/2020 (lvj, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed for BTX GLOBAL on 1/8/20 and answer due 3/9/20. by ERIC WINTERS. (HOWELL, JORDAN) Modified on 2/18/2020 (lvj, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID R. STRUWE on behalf of WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES with Certificate of Service(STRUWE, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF 1/24/20 THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) SHALL BE HELD ON MARCH 31, 2020 AT 10:00AM IN THE READING CHAMBERS. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/24/20. 1/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF 1/24/20 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/24/20. 1/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM J. PANTANO on behalf of ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 12/12/2019 THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST MS. RIMBAUT ONLY ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. MS. RIMBAUT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCUMENT NO. 3) IS WITHDRAWN AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/12/19. 12/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by BILL TAMPANO.(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of BILL TAMPANO with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(STOKES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN L. HOWELL on behalf of ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS with Jury Demanded(HOWELL, JORDAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT W. ZIMMERMAN on behalf of ERIC WINTERS, KETURAH WINTERS with Jury Demanded(ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES.(SHAPIRO, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ROSE ANNE MCGOVERN-RIMBAUT.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAPIRO, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES HOLDINGS, INC. for WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES. by WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROSE ANNE MCGOVERN-RIMBAUT, WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES from PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 191001324. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206945) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(jaa, ) Modified on 11/18/2019 (jaa, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WINTERS et al v. AKZO NOBEL SURFACE CHEMISTRY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTX GLOBAL LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGH-TECH PACKING & CRATING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDP International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLDWIDE FLIGHT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GREIF PACKAGING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KETURAH WINTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC WINTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SPRAY-TEK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?