Mountech IP LLC v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Mountech IP LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00866
Filed: June 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Mountech IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00865-MN, 1:20-cv-00866-MN, 1:20-cv-00867-MN(mal)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (7 in 1:20-cv-00865-MN), (8 in 1:20-cv-00866-MN), (8 in 1:20-cv-00867-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Mountech IP LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/30/2020. (dlw)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Mountech IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 09/04/2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 9/4/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/21/2020. (dlw)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to 09/04/2020 - filed by Mountech IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mountech IP LLC. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Chong, Jimmy)
July 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00865-MN, 1:20-cv-00866-MN, 1:20-cv-00867-MN (rjb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
June 28, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mountech IP LLC. (myr)
June 28, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,991,784 ;US 8,311,805. (myr)
June 28, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
June 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3023213.) - filed by Mountech IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountech IP LLC v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountech IP LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?