Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. et al v. Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA et al
Plaintiff: Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. and Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA and Lupin Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv00911
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed, coordinated order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/19/2020. (dlw)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd..(Farnan, Michael)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd..(Farnan, Michael)
July 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren N. Martin for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S. and Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven C. Cherny for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S. and Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM against Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 7/28/2020 (dlw).
July 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nancy L. Zhang for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S., for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 20-cv-00911-MN, 1:20-cv-00697-MN (myr)
July 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Raymond N. Nimrod and Geoffrey A. Kirsner for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S. and Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00911-MN, 1:20-cv-00697-MN(kmd)
July 10, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew A. Traupman for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S. and Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00697-MN, 1:20-cv-00911-MN(kmd)
July 10, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amanda K. Antons for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S. and Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00697-MN, 1:20-cv-00911-MN(kmd)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Raymond N. Nimrod, Steven C. Cherny, Matthew A. Traupman, Amanda Antons, Geoffrey A. Kirsner, Lauren N. Martin, and Nancy L. Zhang filed by Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/10/2020. (dlw)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Raymond N. Nimrod, Steven C. Cherny, Matthew A. Traupman, Amanda Antons, Geoffrey A. Kirsner, Lauren N. Martin, and Nancy L. Zhang - filed by Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian)
July 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys William A. Rakoczy, Paul J. Molino, Anuj K. Wadhwa, Conly S. Wythers for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul J. Molino for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA,for Lupin Limited, for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William A. Rakoczy for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA,for Lupin Limited, for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Paul J. Molino, Anuj K. Wadhwa and Conly S. Wythers filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/9/2020. (dlw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Paul J. Molino, Anuj K. Wadhwa and Conly S. Wythers - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rakoczy Pro Hac Certification, #2 Molino Pro Hac Certification, #3 Wadhwa Pro Hac Certification, #4 Wythers Pro Hac Certification)(Phillips, John)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Limited for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Limited.(Phillips, John) Modified on 7/9/2020 (dlw).
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S.: For Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; Lupin Limited waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Farnan, Brian)
July 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Farnan, Michael)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Vifor Pharma AG, Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd.; Corporate Parent Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. for Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S. filed by Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. (nmg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 10,682,376 B2; US 10,695,367 B2. (nmg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: N/A. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached. (nmg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3041236.) - filed by Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd., Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd. et al v. Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Anuj K. Wadhwa
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Conly S. Wythers
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA
Represented By: Anuj K. Wadhwa
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Conly S. Wythers
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Represented By: Anuj K. Wadhwa
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Conly S. Wythers
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Amanda K. Antons
Represented By: Lauren N. Martin
Represented By: Nancy L. Zhang
Represented By: Matthew A. Traupman
Represented By: Raymond N. Nimrod
Represented By: Steven C. Cherny
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Kirsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vifor Fresenius Medical Care Renal Pharma France S.A.S.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Amanda K. Antons
Represented By: Lauren N. Martin
Represented By: Nancy L. Zhang
Represented By: Matthew A. Traupman
Represented By: Raymond N. Nimrod
Represented By: Steven C. Cherny
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Kirsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?