786 Challenger St. LLC v. Bombardier Aerospace Corporation
Plaintiff: 786 Challenger St. LLC
Defendant: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00919
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Hunter, Travis)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunter, Travis)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Kathleen Pedi on behalf of Bombardier Aerospace Corporation (Pedi, Nicole)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Steven Hunter on behalf of Bombardier Aerospace Corporation (Hunter, Travis)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 28, 2020 filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/23/20. (ntl)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 28, 2020 - filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Pedi, Nicole)
July 22, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David Myre for 786 Challenger St. LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. Myre of QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP filed by 786 Challenger St. LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/22/20. (ntl)
July 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 786 Challenger St. LLC. Bombardier Aerospace Corporation served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. Myre of QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP - filed by 786 Challenger St. LLC. (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by 786 Challenger St. LLC. (amf)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Bombardier Aerospace Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3044492.) - filed by 786 Challenger St. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 786 Challenger St. LLC v. Bombardier Aerospace Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Pedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 786 Challenger St. LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. Briggs, Jr.
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: David Myre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?