Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al v. Lupin Limited et al
Plaintiff: Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv00922
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeremiah S. Helm for Lupin Limited, for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/31/2020. (dlw)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher P. Hill for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher P. Hill filed by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/19/2020. (dlw)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher P. Hill - filed by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel)(Silver, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys William F. Cavanaugh and Zhiqiang Liu for Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. and Zhiqiang Liu filed by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/13/2020. (dlw)
August 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. and Zhiqiang Liu - filed by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. and Zhiqiang Liu)(Silver, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan E. Bachand for Lupin Limited,for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 10, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William R. Zimmerman for Lupin Limited, for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Zimmerman, Jonathan E. Bachand and Jeremiah S. Helm filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/10/2020. (dlw)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Zimmerman, Jonathan E. Bachand and Jeremiah S. Helm - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Zimmerman Pro Hac Certification, #2 Bachand Pro Hac Certification, #3 Helm Pro Hac Certification)(Bilson, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Corporate Parent No parent corporations for Lupin Limited filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Limited.(Phillips, John) Modified on 8/11/2020 (dlw).
July 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael F. Werno for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Bruce M. Wexler and Chad J. Peterman for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Lupin defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 19, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Limited answer due 8/19/2020; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 8/19/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/16/2020. (dlw)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce M. Wexler, Chad J. Peterman, and Michael F. Werno filed by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/15/2020. (dlw)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce M. Wexler, Chad J. Peterman, and Michael F. Werno - filed by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Bruce Wexler, Chad J. Peterman, and Michael F. Werno)(Silver, Daniel)
July 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Service regarding Defedant Lupin Limited made on July 8, 2020 by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 7/16/2020 (dlw).
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Lupin to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to August 19, 2020 - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 7/8/2020. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (lak)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (lak)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Arbor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Corporate Parent KKR Crown Investors LP, Corporate Parent KKR & Co. Inc. for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC filed by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (lak)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,157,584 ;7,572,920 ;9,066,936. (lak)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/24/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/24/2022. (lak)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3047193.) - filed by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al v. Lupin Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremiah S. Helm
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan E. Bachand
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Represented By: Jeremiah S. Helm
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan E. Bachand
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Chad J. Peterman
Represented By: Christopher P. Hill
Represented By: Michael F. Werno
Represented By: Bruce M. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh
Represented By: Zhiqiang Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?