In re: John Varvatos Enterprises, Inc., et al.
Appellee: Lion/Hendrix Corporation, Lion/Hendrix Cayman Limited, John Varvatos Enterprises, Inc. and John Varvatos Apparel Corp. (3394)
Appellant: Tessa Knox
Case Number: 1:2020cv00937
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Withdrawing the Bankruptcy Appeal from Mediation re: #12 Recommendation. ORDER setting briefing schedule: ( Appellant Brief due by 9/25/2020., Appellee Brief due by 10/26/2020., Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/9/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/25/2020. (fms)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Dunnegan filed by Tessa Knox. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/20/2020. (nmf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/19/20. (cak)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Dunnegan - filed by Tessa Knox. (Billion, Mark)
August 6, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 11 was removed from the docket since it should not have been efiled. (cak)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Lion/Hendrix Cayman Limited - Appellee's Counter-Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Greecher, Sean)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan M. Sedlak filed by Lion/Hendrix Cayman Limited, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. Bromley filed by Lion/Hendrix Cayman Limited. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/17/2020. (nmf)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Thursday, August 6, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/16/20. (cak)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan M. Sedlak - filed by Lion/Hendrix Cayman Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Greecher, Sean)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. Bromley - filed by Lion/Hendrix Cayman Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Greecher, Sean)
July 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 14, 2020 Remark : Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (rwc)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING #3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Expedited Hearing of the Appeal from a Final Order of the Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/14/2020. (dlw)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Expedited Hearing of the Appeal from a Final Order of the Bankruptcy Court, by Lion/Hendrix Cayman Limited. (Greecher, Sean) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER re #3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Expedited Hearing of the Appeal from a Final Order of the Bankruptcy Court - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellee Lyon/Hendrix Cayman Ltd. shall file a response to the Emergency Motion no later than NOON on 7/14/2020. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/13/2020. (dlw)
July 13, 2020 Remark: Duty Judge (MN) notified re: (DI 3) (rwc)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Expedited Hearing of the Appeal from a Final Order of the Bankruptcy Court - filed by Tessa Knox. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of William Dunnegan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Motion, #4 Exhibit Proposed Form of Order, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Billion, Mark) Modified on 7/13/2020 (dlw).
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal)
July 13, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mal)
July 13, 2020 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mal)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 7/10/2020 by Mary F. Walrath in Bankruptcy case number 20-50623-MFW. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Tessa Knox. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Statement of Issues, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: John Varvatos Enterprises, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lion/Hendrix Corporation
Represented By: Sean T. Greecher,
Represented By: Andrew R. Workman
Represented By: Derek C. Abbott
Represented By: Pauline K. Morgan
Represented By: Matthew Talmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lion/Hendrix Cayman Limited
Represented By: Andrew R. Workman
Represented By: Derek C. Abbott
Represented By: Sean T. Greecher
Represented By: Pauline K. Morgan
Represented By: Matthew Talmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Varvatos Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Sean T. Greecher,
Represented By: Andrew R. Workman
Represented By: Derek C. Abbott
Represented By: Pauline K. Morgan
Represented By: Matthew Talmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Varvatos Apparel Corp. (3394)
Represented By: Sean T. Greecher,
Represented By: Andrew R. Workman
Represented By: Derek C. Abbott
Represented By: Pauline K. Morgan
Represented By: Matthew Talmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tessa Knox
Represented By: Mark M. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?