Goureau et al v. Lemonis et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Menkin and Nicholas Goureau
Defendant: Roberta Raffel, MLG Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, Marcus Lemonis, LLC, Bobbi Lemonis and ML Retail, LLC
Nominal Defendant: ML Fashion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00940
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 Letter to Court of Chancery from Clerk USDC regarding Remand Order - re #20 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (mdb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendants' motion to dismiss (D.I. 4) shall remain pending for the Chancery Court upon remand. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/21/2020. (dlw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Sean J. Bellew regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to the Court of Chancery for the State of Delaware - re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Bellew, Sean)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Michael)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, LLC. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 8/5/2020 (mdb).
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nicholas Goureau, Stephanie Menkin.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/11/2020. (Bellew, Sean)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholas Goureau, Stephanie Menkin. (Bellew, Sean)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER - The parties left a message with Chambers regarding the motion to dismiss. To be clear, the Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' request to delay the briefing on the motion to dismiss and has DENIED the request. Plaintiffs' answering brief is thus due on August 4, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/31/2020. (dlw)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORAL ORDER DENYING #12 Motion for a Stay of Proceedings on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/30/2020. (dlw)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Nicholas Goureau, Stephanie Menkin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bellew, Sean)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Michael J. Farnan re #10 Answering Brief in Opposition by ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 7/30/2020 (dlw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2020. (Farnan, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER re #8 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Their Motion to Remand - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Answering Brief for the Motion to Remand shall be due on or before 7/29/2020 and the Reply Brief shall be due on or before 7/31/2020. (Set Briefing Schedule: re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Answering Brief due 7/29/2020. Reply Brief due 7/31/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/27/2020. (dlw)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Their Motion to Remand and for a Stay of Proceedings on Defendants Motion to Dismiss - filed by Nicholas Goureau, Stephanie Menkin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bellew, Sean) Modified on 7/27/2020 (dlw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholas Goureau, Stephanie Menkin. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bellew, Sean) Modified on 7/27/2020 (dlw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Nicholas Goureau, Stephanie Menkin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bellew, Sean) Modified on 7/27/2020 (dlw).
July 23, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael D. Wexler for ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC and Marcus Lemonis, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
July 22, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jesse M. Coleman for ML Retail, LLC, for MLG Retail, LLC, for Marcus Lemonis, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/4/2020. (Farnan, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. Wexler and Jesse M. Coleman - filed by ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. Wexler and Jesse M. Coleman filed by Marcus Lemonis, LLC, ML Retail, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/21/2020. (dlw)
July 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Ct, Case Number 2020-0486-MTZ (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3059292)- filed by ML Retail, LLC, Marcus Lemonis, LLC, ML Fashion, LLC, MLG Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goureau et al v. Lemonis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Raffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLG Retail, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Jesse M. Coleman
Represented By: Michael D. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Lemonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Lemonis, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Jesse M. Coleman
Represented By: Michael D. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbi Lemonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML Retail, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Jesse M. Coleman
Represented By: Michael D. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Menkin
Represented By: Sean J. Bellew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Goureau
Represented By: Sean J. Bellew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: ML Fashion, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?