PANKOWSKI v. ETHICON, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN PANKOWSKI
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL, LLC, Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson and SECANT MEDICAL INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00969
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Thomas Edwards on behalf of KATHLEEN PANKOWSKI (Edwards, Philip)
August 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayley J. Reese on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Reese, Hayley)
August 4, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Brown on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Brown, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kelly, Michael)
July 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/21/2020. (myr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:19-cv-05958. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (DOC. NO. #4 ) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER (DOC. NO. #7 ) IS GRANTED IN PART. THIS MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/17/20.6/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (DOC. NO. #19 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/25/20.3/25/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curran Opinion, #2 Exhibit B - Stewart Opinion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (DOC. NO. #17 ) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION (DOC. NO. #17 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/5/2020. 3/5/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by KATHLEEN PANKOWSKI. (QUIRK, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (DOC. NO. #14 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION (DOC. NO. #14 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/24/2020. 1/24/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Main Document 15 replaced on 2/3/2020) (rt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(CALLSEN, JULIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit PLs' Response to DEs Ethicon, Inc.'s and Johnson & Johnson's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Order, #4 Exhibit Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by KATHLEEN PANKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-state-court filing, #2 Exhibit B-state-court filing, #3 Exhibit C-state-court order, #4 Exhibit D-unpublished state-court opinion, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(QUIRK, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by KATHLEEN PANKOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Order)(QUIRK, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN on behalf of ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(FLYNN, MOLLY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. MERK on behalf of ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MERK, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of August 2014, #2 Exhibit B - Order of January 2015, #3 Exhibit C - Response of PL, #4 Exhibit D - Order of November 2019)(CALLSEN, JULIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Memorandum in Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - November 19, 2019 Order, #4 Exhibit B-Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C-Master Long Form Complaint)(CALLSEN, JULIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL: 1. MARK CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-5958 AS RELATED TO CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-CV-4503; AND 2. PLACE CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-CV-5958 IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE DOCKET.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/18/2019. 12/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by KATHLEEN PANKOWSKI.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-unpublished court opinion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUIRK, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. QUIRK on behalf of KATHLEEN PANKOWSKI with Certificate of Service(QUIRK, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON & JOHNSON for ETHICON, INC.. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON from COURT OF COMMON PLEASE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191001167. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208504)(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PANKOWSKI v. ETHICON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN PANKOWSKI
Represented By: Philip Thomas Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Hayley J. Reese
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Hayley J. Reese
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECANT MEDICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?