Ross v. St. Jude Medical, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Ross
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, LLC., Abbott Laboratories, INC. and St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00971
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Christopher J Burke
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER: David G. Culley, Esquire shall initiate the teleconference call scheduled for 1/19/21 at 10:00 a.m. with Judge Thynge. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/15/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01128-CJB et al.(cak)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of these matters and whether there is any interest/timing for mediation. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/15/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01128-CJB et al.(cak)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint to 21 days after resolution of pending motions in Guinn, Check and Mellott cases filed by St. Jude Medical, LLC., Abbott Laboratories, INC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/1/2020. (dlb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint to 21 days after resolution of pending motions in Guinn, Check and Mellott cases - filed by Abbott Laboratories, INC., St. Jude Medical, LLC.. (Rostocki, Brian)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to September 16, 2020 filed by St. Jude Medical, LLC., Abbott Laboratories, INC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/3/2020. (mlc)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defndants to respond to the Complaint to September 16, 2020 - filed by Abbott Laboratories, INC., St. Jude Medical, LLC.. (Rostocki, Brian)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colleen Ross. Abbott Laboratories, INC. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Culley, David)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colleen Ross. St. Jude Medical, LLC. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Culley, David)
July 30, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The executed summons filed at D.I. 6 and D.I. 7 have been removed from the docket as the incorrect service date was used. Counsel used the date of service of 7/24/2020, when the executed summons yielded that service was effected on 7/27/2020. Counsel is to refile using the correct service date. (nms)
July 30, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: (nms)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER: The case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/29/2020. (nms)
July 29, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The summons returned executed at D.I. 5 and D.I. 6 have been removed from the docket as they were filed using the incorrect filing event codes. Counsel is it refile the executed summons using the "Summons Returned Executed" code thereby allowing answer dates to be set. (nms)
July 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00971-RGA, 1:20-cv-00983-RGA (rjb)
July 22, 2020 Remark:Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (apk)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/22/2020. (nms)
July 22, 2020 Remark: Exit Copies to Duty Judge (RGA) via E-Mail (apk)
July 22, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibits A-C initially filed at D.I. 3 have been removed from that entry and have been added to the filing at D.I. #2 . The consent notice forms have been renumbered from D.I. 4 to D.I. 3. (nms)
July 22, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Abbott Laboratories, INC. on 7/22/2020; St. Jude Medical, LLC. on 7/22/2020. (apk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) Modified on 7/22/2020 (nms).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Abbott Laboratories, INC., St. Jude Medical, LLC. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX034054.) - filed by Colleen Ross.(apk)(#1 Civil Cover Sheet) (apk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #2 Exhibits A-C) (nms).
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. - filed by Colleen Ross. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Motion)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. St. Jude Medical, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, LLC.
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, INC.
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Ross
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?