Almirall, LLC v. Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Almirall, LLC
Defendant: Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2020cv00975
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gerald J Pappert
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Almirall, LLC.(Raucci, Anthony)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James S. Trainor, Jr., R.J. Shea and Elizabeth B. Hagan. Signed by Judge Gerald J. Pappert on 9/8/2020. (nmg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James S. Trainor, Jr., R.J. Shea and Elizabeth B. Hagan - filed by Almirall, LLC. (Raucci, Anthony)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Perrigo Company plc for Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership filed by Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 27, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Patent Report Attachment Removed Per Counsels Request from DI #12 . 7.1 Disclosure Statement Removed and to be Refiled Per Counsels Request. (apk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,161,926. (apk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Separate Defenses of Defendant Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership to Plaintiff's Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership by Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1,)(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 8/27/2020 (apk).
August 12, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys William A. Rakoczy, Christine J. Siwik, Lauren M. Lesko, Gregory A. Duff for Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Christine J. Siwik, Lauren M. Lesko and Gregory A. Duff. Signed by Judge Gerald J. Pappert on 8/11/2020. (nmg)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Christine J. Siwik, Lauren M. Lesko and Gregory A. Duff - filed by Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Gerald J. Pappert on 8/10/2020. (nmg)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to August 26, 2020 - filed by Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership. (Gattuso, Dominick)
July 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gerald J. Pappert of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (due to related case). Please include the initials of the Judge (GJP) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and related papers served on Landon R. Clark, Senior Counsel, Rx Business Perrigo Company on July 27, 2020, filed by Almirall, LLC. (Raucci, Anthony)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Almirall, S.A. for Almirall, LLC filed by Almirall, LLC. (mal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,517,219 B2. (mal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: June 9, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: November 18, 2033.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 12/9/2022. (mal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3078661.) - filed by Almirall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almirall, LLC v. Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo UK FINCO Limited Partnership
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Gregory A. Duff
Represented By: Lauren M. Lesko
Represented By: Christine J. Siwik
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almirall, LLC
Represented By: Anthony David Raucci
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?