Murphy v. St. Jude Medical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00983
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Christopher J Burke
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER: David G. Culley, Esquire shall initiate the teleconference call scheduled for 1/19/21 at 10:00 a.m. with Judge Thynge. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/15/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01128-CJB et al.(cak)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of these matters and whether there is any interest/timing for mediation. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/15/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01128-CJB et al.(cak)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint to 21 days after resolution of pending motions in Guinn, Check and Mellott cases filed by St. Jude Medical, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/1/2020. (dlb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint to 21 days after resolution of pending motions in Guinn, Check and Mellott cases - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Rostocki, Brian)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Murphy. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Culley, David)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Murphy. St. Jude Medical, LLC served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Culley, David)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to September 21, 2020 filed by St. Jude Medical, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/3/2020. (mlc)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to respond to the Complaint to September 21, 2020 - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Rostocki, Brian)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: The case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/29/2020. (nms)
July 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00971-RGA, 1:20-cv-00983-RGA (rjb)
July 27, 2020 Remark: $400 filing fee paid 7/27/2020. Receipt number DEX034070. (amf)
July 24, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to file Complaint under seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/24/2020. (nmg)
July 24, 2020 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (RGA). (nmg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and St. Jude Medical, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400 (Check expected to arrive 7/27/2020.) - filed by Michael Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to file Complaint under seal - filed by Michael Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. St. Jude Medical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?