UCB, Inc. et al v. Annora Pharma Private Limited et al
Plaintiff: UCB Biopharma SRL and UCB, Inc.
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Lupin Ltd., Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Micro Labs Ltd., Annora Pharma Private Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Micro Labs USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00987
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For MSN Laboratories Private Ltd. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For Apotex Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For Apotex Corp. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For Annora Pharma Private Limited waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manisha A. Desai filed by UCB, Inc., UCB Biopharma SRL. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/10/2020. (fms)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manisha A. Desai - filed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For Micro Labs USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For Micro Labs Ltd. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.: For Lupin Ltd. waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter C. Richardson and Traci Medford-Rosow of Richardson & Rosow LLC filed by UCB, Inc., UCB Biopharma SRL, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George F. Pappas, Philip S. May, Cody J. Reeves, Alexa R. Hansen and Hangcheng (Robert) Zhou of Covington & Burling LLP filed by UCB, Inc., UCB Biopharma SRL, #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Trainor, Ryan Johnson and So Yeon Choe of Fenwick & West LLP filed by UCB, Inc., UCB Biopharma SRL. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/7/2020. (fms)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter C. Richardson and Traci Medford-Rosow of Richardson & Rosow LLC - filed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Trainor, Ryan Johnson and So Yeon Choe of Fenwick & West LLP - filed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George F. Pappas, Philp S. May, Cody J. Reeves, Alexa R. Hansen and Hangcheng (Robert) Zhou of Covington & Burling LLP - filed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
July 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (Attachments: #1 Summons- Annora Pharma, #2 Summons- Apotex corp., #3 Summons- Apotex Inc., #4 Summons- Aurobindo, #5 Summons- Lupin, #6 Summons- Micro Labs Limited, #7 Summons- Micro Labs USA, #8 Summons- MSN Lab, #9 Summons- MSN Pharma, #10 Summons- Zydus)(sam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent UCB SA, Other Affiliate UCB Pharma SA for UCB Biopharma SRL; Corporate Parent UCB SA, Other Affiliate UCB Finance N.V., Other Affiliate UCB Holding Inc. for UCB, Inc. filed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc. (sam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: SEE ATTACHED. Date of Expiration of Patent: 02/21/2021.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/12/2023. (sam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,784,197 B2 ;6,911,461 B2 ;8,492,416 B2. (sam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement- filed against Annora Pharma Private Limited, Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Lupin Ltd., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Micro Labs Ltd., Micro Labs USA, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3084943.) - filed by UCB Biopharma SRL, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UCB, Inc. et al v. Annora Pharma Private Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micro Labs Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annora Pharma Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Laboratories Private Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micro Labs USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB Biopharma SRL
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?