In re: SS Body Armor I, Inc., et al
Appellee: The Recovery Trust for SS Body Armor I, Inc., SS Body Armor I, Inc. and Point Blank Solutions, Inc., et al.
Appellant: Jon Jacks
Case Number: 1:2020cv01034
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephonic Mediation Conference is set for 12/2/2020 beginning at 10:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/9/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01033-MN, 1:20-cv-01034-MN(cak)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by The Recovery Trust for SS Body Armor I, Inc. //Appellees Recovery Trust and Post-Confirmation Debtor's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim No. 402 filed by D. David Cohen, #2 Exhibit Claim No. 434 filed by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP, #3 Exhibit Claim No. 568 filed by D. David Cohen, #4 Exhibit Opinion of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit)(Gibson, Jason) Modified on 9/1/2020 (dlw).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 8/31/2020 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge regarding ADR. Counsel for appellees shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/19/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01033-MN, 1:20-cv-01034-MN(cak)
August 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01033-UNA, 1:20-cv-01034-UNA(nms)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal)
August 3, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mal)
August 3, 2020 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mal)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 7/21/2020 by Chief Judge Christopher S. Sontchi in Bankruptcy case number 10-11255. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Jon Jacks. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Order, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: SS Body Armor I, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Recovery Trust for SS Body Armor I, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Scott James Leonhardt
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SS Body Armor I, Inc.
Represented By: James E. O'Neill, III
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Point Blank Solutions, Inc., et al.
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Scott James Leonhardt
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jon Jacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?