FS Algarrobo Limited et al v. Columbia Shipmanagement Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Austral Limited and FS Algarrobo Limited
Defendant: Columbia Shipmanagement Ltd.
Garnishee: Linblad Expeditions, LLC, Freepoint Commodities LLC, Novum Energy Trading Inc., UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC, Wilhelmsen Ship Management (USA) Inc., Shell Trading Services Company, Marathon Petroleum Supply LLC, E D and F Man Liquid Products LLC, Trafigura Trading LLC, NYK Line (North America) Inc., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Navig8 Product Tankers LLC, Bacardi Corporation, Wilhelmsen Ships Service, Inc., Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Castlelake, L.P. and Castlelake Holdings, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Timothy J. Houseal
Case Number: 1:2020cv01040
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited as to Garnishee Navig8 Product Tankers LLC (Houseal, Timothy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited.(Houseal, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited as to Garnishees Castlelake Holdings, LLC, Castlelake, L.P., Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc. and Novum Energy Trading, Inc. (Houseal, Timothy)
August 28, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment, Verified Complaint, Order for Issuance of Writ, Order for Service of Writ and Interrogatories filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited.(Houseal, Timothy)
August 28, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited as to Garnishees Bacardi Corporation, E D and F Man Liquid Products LLC, NYK Line (North America), Inc. Shell Trading Services Company, Wilhelmsen Ship Management (USA), Inc., and Wilhelmsen Ships Service, Inc. (Houseal, Timothy)
August 26, 2020 Filing 47 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Castlelake, L.P. Counsel may print the writ from the docket for service. (nmf)
August 26, 2020 Filing 46 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Castlelake Holdings, LLC. Counsel may print the writ from the docket for service. (nmf)
August 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney J. Stephen Simms for FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Stephen Simms filed by FS Andino Limited, FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Andes Limited. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/21/2020. (nmf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Writs, Complaint, Order for Issuance, Order for Service on Garnishees filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavits of Process Server)(Houseal, Timothy)
August 19, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment - filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (Attachments: #1 Writ for Maritime Attachment as to Garnishee Castlelake Holdings, LLC, #2 Writ for Maritime Attachment as to Garnishee Castlelake, L.P.)(Houseal, Timothy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited as to only Garnishees Valero Marketing and Supply Company, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation and Trafigura Trading LLC (Houseal, Timothy)
August 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 6, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Remark: Original Issued Writs may be picked up by Courier at the Clerk's Office or Counsel Can Print them out to use. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 42 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 41 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 40 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Trafigura Trading LLC. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 39 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Wilhelmsen Ships Service, Inc.. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 38 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Wilhelmsen Ship Management (USA) Inc.. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 37 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Shell Trading Services Company. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 36 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to NYK Line (North America) Inc.. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 35 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Novum Energy Trading Inc.. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 34 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Navig8 Product Tankers LLC. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 33 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Marathon Petroleum Supply LLC. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 32 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Linblad Expeditions, LLC. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 31 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 30 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Freepoint Commodities LLC. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 29 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 28 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to E D and F Man Liquid Products LLC. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 27 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Bacardi Corporation. (nmg)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - granting #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian Timothy J. Houseal appointed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/6/20. (rwc)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - granting #3 Motion for Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/6/20. (rwc)
August 5, 2020 Remark : Notified Duty Judge's chambers re: DI 24. (rwc)
August 5, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of J. Stephen Simms re #1 Complaint,,, Verification of Complaint filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
August 5, 2020 Remark: Pursuant review by Duty Judge, this request is governed by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Supplemental Rule B, requires that a plaintiff (1) file a verified complaint requesting attachment and (2) file an affidavit stating that, to the affiants knowledge, or on information and belief, the defendant cannot be found within the district. Fed. R. Civ. P. Supp. R. B(1)(a)-(b). No action will be taken until the appropriate affidavit has been filed by Counsel. (rwc) Modified on 8/5/2020 (rwc).
August 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Stephen Simms - filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited. (Houseal, Timothy)
August 4, 2020 Remark : Duty Judge CFC recused himself. Exit copies to Chief Judge for review. (rwc)
August 4, 2020 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge CFC. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 22 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fancy Holdings S.A. for FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Valero Marketing and Supply Company by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Trafigura Trading LLC by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Wilhelmsen Ships Service, Inc. by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Wilhelmsen Ship Management (USA) Inc. by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Shell Trading Services Company by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: NYK Line (North America) Inc. by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Novum Energy Trading Inc. by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Navig8 Product Tankers LLC by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Marathon Petroleum Supply LLC by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Linblad Expeditions, LLC by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc. by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: Freepoint Commodities LLC by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee:ExxonMobil Oil Corporation by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee: E D and F Man Liquid Products LLC by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment to Garnishee:Bacardi Corporation by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION and Memorandum For Appointment for Service of Writ of MaritimeAttachment and Garnishment - filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION and Memorandum for Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - filed by FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Andino Limited, FS Arica Limited, FS Austral Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT WITH REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT filed against Bacardi Corporation, Columbia Shipmanagement Ltd., E D and F Man Liquid Products LLC, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Freepoint Commodities LLC, Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc., Linblad Expeditions, LLC, Marathon Petroleum Supply LLC, NYK Line (North America) Inc., Navig8 Product Tankers LLC, Novum Energy Trading Inc., Shell Trading Services Company, Trafigura Trading LLC, UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Wilhelmsen Ship Management (USA) Inc., Wilhelmsen Ships Service, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3106332.) - filed by FS Arica Limited, FS Algarrobo Limited, FS Andes Limited, FS Austral Limited, FS Andino Limited. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Clerk to Request to Expedite Handling of Motions, #2 Appendix, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FS Algarrobo Limited et al v. Columbia Shipmanagement Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Linblad Expeditions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Freepoint Commodities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Novum Energy Trading Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Wilhelmsen Ship Management (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Shell Trading Services Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Marathon Petroleum Supply LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: E D and F Man Liquid Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Trafigura Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: NYK Line (North America) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Navig8 Product Tankers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bacardi Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Wilhelmsen Ships Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Castlelake, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Castlelake Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Andino Limited
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Represented By: J. Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Arica Limited
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Represented By: J. Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Andes Limited
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Represented By: J. Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Austral Limited
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Represented By: J. Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Algarrobo Limited
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Represented By: J. Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Shipmanagement Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Timothy J. Houseal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?