Loughlin et al v. Harada et al
Plaintiff: Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield and Suzanne Loughlin
Defendant: Eyal Hen, Robert A. Berman, David Hanlon, Steven D. Croxton and Christine Harada
Case Number: 1:2020cv01055
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Satterfield, Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen. Robert A. Berman served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Anthony, David)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Satterfield, Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen. Eyal Hen served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Anthony, David)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Satterfield, Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen. Steven D. Croxton served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Anthony, David)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Satterfield, Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen. David Hanlon served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Anthony, David)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Satterfield, Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen. Christine Harada served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Anthony, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to all defendants.(please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service) (sam)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Robert A. Berman, Steven D. Croxton, David Hanlon, Christine Harada, Eyal Hen - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3118611.) - filed by James Satterfield, Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loughlin et al v. Harada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Hen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Croxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Rhulen
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: Brian Michael Gottesman
Represented By: Peter C. McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Satterfield
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: Brian Michael Gottesman
Represented By: Peter C. McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Loughlin
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: Brian Michael Gottesman
Represented By: Peter C. McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?