Hodgson Mill Corporation v. Hodgson Mill, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hodgson Mill Corporation
Defendant: Hodgson Mill, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01073
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hodgson Mill, Inc. (see D.I. #6 Request for Default filed by Hodgson Mill Corporation). (nms)
October 15, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Two exhibits have been added to the filing at D.I. #6 . (nms)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Default as to Hodgson Mill, Inc. - filed by Hodgson Mill Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (nms).
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hodgson Mill Corporation. Hodgson Mill, Inc. served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cell-nique Corp. for Hodgson Mill Corporation filed by Hodgson Mill Corporation. (nmg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Hodgson Mill, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3135203.) - filed by Hodgson Mill Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodgson Mill Corporation v. Hodgson Mill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hodgson Mill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hodgson Mill Corporation
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?