Jones v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dorcas R. Jones
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01074
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/2020. (myr)
September 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney F. Michael Friedman for Dorcas R. Jones added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney F. Michael Friedman filed by Dorcas R. Jones. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/2/20. (ntl)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney F. Michael Friedman - filed by Dorcas R. Jones. (Linarducci, Gary)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (IFP Filed. No Filing Fee Paid) - filed by Dorcas R. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Dorcas R. Jones. (mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorcas R. Jones
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Represented By: F. Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?