In re: Seroquel XR (Extended Release Quetiapine Fumarate) Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: JM Smith Corporation on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated doing business as Smith Drug Company, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Kinney Drugs, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund and Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca L P and Accord Healthcare Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01076
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Responses & Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Supplemental Responses & Objections to Plaintiff's Interrogatory Nos. 1 & 3 to AstraZeneca filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian Dell on July 10, 2023 filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Bennett, Blake)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen D. Cary on July 25, 2023 filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Bennett, Blake)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Carlton on July 12, 2023 filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Bennett, Blake)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shelly Meachum on June 29, 2023 filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Bennett, Blake)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fang Yu Liu on July 27, 2023 filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Bennett, Blake)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael He on July 14, 2023 filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Bennett, Blake)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas A. Stevens on July 19, 2023 filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Bennett, Blake)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Megan Smith on June 15, 2023 filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Bennett, Blake)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE OF SERVICE of the Omnibus Responses and Objections of End-Payor Plaintiffs to Defendants Notices of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6). filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Avellino, Jason)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Retailer Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Defendants Notices of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 329 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from J M Smith Drug Company - re #308 Notice to Take Deposition filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Keener, Carmella)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. - re #309 Notice to Take Deposition filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Keener, Carmella)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission on Defendant Astrazeneca and Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Astrazeneca filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Keener, Carmella)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant AstraZeneca's Amended Initial Disclosures filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Corrected Notice of Service re Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 4-13) to Defendants filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Keener, Carmella)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Health Care Service Corp.'s Responses and Objections to Astrazeneca's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Health Care Service Corporation filed by Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation.(Bennett, Blake)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE OF SERVICE of End-Payor Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Defendants Fourth Set of Interrogatories filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Avellino, Jason)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Astrazeneca'sThird Set of Interrogatories filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Keener, Carmella)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Retailer Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to AstraZeneca's Third Set of Interrogatories to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Retailer Plaintiffs filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE of RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF CVS PHARMACY INC. by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE of RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE of RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS THE UNIFORMED FIREFIGHTERSASSOCIATION OF GREATER NEW YORK SECURITY BENEFIT FUND AND THE RETIRED FIREFIGHTERSSECURITY BENEFIT FUND OF THE UNIFORMED FIREFIGHTERSASSOCIATION by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE of OF RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE of OF RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF LAW ENFORCEMENT HEALTH BENEFITS by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE of OF RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF WELFARE PLAN OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, AND 137R by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE of OF RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF SERGEANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION HEALTH & WELFARE FUND by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Interrogatories to Plaintiffs filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth Peled for AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, and AstraZeneca UK Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anna Searle for AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, and AstraZeneca UK Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (jdb)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Walgreen Co. filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiffs Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff The Kroger Co. filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff JM Smith Corporation filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Hy-Vee Inc. filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff H-E-B L.P. filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Albertsons Company Inc. filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anna Searle & Elizabeth Peled - filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Anna Searle & Elizabeth Peled)(Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #303 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anna Searle & Elizabeth Peled, filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/2/2023. (kmd)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 REDACTED VERSION of #298 Notice of Service by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Astrazeneca's Second Set of Interrogatories filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Keener, Carmella)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena for Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, #2 Subpoena for NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund)(Joyce, Alexandra)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EPPs Notice of Service of Supplemental Objections & Responses to Defendants Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Avellino, Jason)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Joyce, Alexandra)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed to Padagis South Carolina LLC and Return filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Return (Padagis South Carolina LLC))(Keener, Carmella)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Retailer Plaintiffs Supplemental Objections and Responses to AstraZeneca's Second Set of Interrogatories to All Plaintiffs filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Astrazeneca's Second Set of Interrogatories filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Keener, Carmella)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTICE OF SERVICE of End-Payor Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to AstraZenecas Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Avellino, Jason)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas directed to Perrigo Company of South Carolina and Prasco,LLC filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Keener, Carmella)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas to Aurobindo, Ingenus, ACI, Healthcare, and Novast filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena and Affidavit of Service of ACI Healthcare USA, Inc., #2 Exhibit Subpoena and Affidavit of Service to Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., #3 Exhibit Subpoena and Affidavit of Service to ScieGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #4 Exhibit Subpoena and Affidavit of Service to Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, #5 Exhibit Subpoena and Affidavit of Service to Novast Laboratories, Ltd.)(Avellino, Jason)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dillon M. Knight - filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Silverstein, Alan)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (290 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC), (42 in 1:21-cv-01744-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dillon M. Knight, filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/5/2023. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:21-cv-01744-CFC(kmd)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dillon M. Knight for Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:21-cv-01744-CFC(mpb)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Interrogatories to Plaintiffs filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to AstraZeneca's Second Set of Interrogatories filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Keener, Carmella)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EPP Service of Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Avellino, Jason)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Retailer Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to AstraZeneca's Second Set of Interrogatories to All Plaintiffs filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE OF SERVICE of of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Intellipharmaceutics LLC, Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Athey, J.)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Macleods Pharma USA, Inc. and TruPharma LLC filed by Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Bennett, Blake)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Service of Subpoenas directed to Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Osmotica Pharmaceutical Corporation by JM Smith Corporation (Keener, Carmella)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE of Subpoena directed to non-party Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Subpoena directed to non-party Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals)(Athey, J.)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Deerfield Entities' Objections to Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action. (nmf)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Responses & Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) to AstraZeneca filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Elise M. Baumgarten and Simon A. Latcovich for AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Third Set of Interrogatories to End-Payor Plaintiffs filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESPONSE to Motion re #275 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Motion for Reconsideration and Reargument (D.I. 266) filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 REDACTED VERSION of #273 Declaration by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Joyce, Alexandra)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Motion for Reconsideration and Reargument (D.I. 266) - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Averment of Counsel Pursuant to D. Del. Loc. R. 7.1.1, #2 Certificate of Compliance Word Count Certification as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Motion for Reconsideration and Reargument (D.I. 266), #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Motion for Reconsideration or Reargument (D.I. 266), #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Reply in Further Support of Motion for Reconsideration and Reargument (D.I. 266), #5 Certificate of Compliance Word Count Certification as to Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and Reargument (D.I. 266))(Keener, Carmella)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 275 and 276 have been previously deleted per counsels request. Counsel had originally filed the previous motions without all of the attachments and supporting exhibits. Counsel will re-file with correct attachments. (apk)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon Latcovich and Elise M. Baumgarten - filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca,LP, Astrazeneca L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Simon Latcovich, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certifcation by Elise M. Baumgarten, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Joyce, Alexandra)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #274 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon Latcovich and Elise M. Baumgarten, filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca L.P., AstraZeneca,LP. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/10/2023. (kmd)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 273 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #272 Response to Motion, of Daniel M. Silver, Esq. by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 272 RESPONSE to Motion re #266 MOTION for Reargument re #262 Order (Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) and Local Civil Rule 7.1.5 for Reconsideration or Reargument Regarding the Court's February 9, 2023 Order Denying Plaintiffs filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE OF SERVICE of subpoena duces tecum on Deerfield CTLT L.P., Deerfield Generics, L.P. and Deerfield Management Company, L.P. filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Keener, Carmella)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan M. Gerstein on behalf of J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Keener, Carmella)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #270 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan M. Gerstein on behalf of J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company, filed by JM Smith Corporation. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/2/2023. (kmd)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 269 REDACTED VERSION of #266 MOTION for Reargument re #262 Order (Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) and Local Civil Rule 7.1.5 for Reconsideration or Reargument Regarding the Court's February 9, 2023 Order Denying Plaintiffs by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keener, Carmella)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Second Set of Interrogatories to All Plaintiffs filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 AFFIDAVIT of David B. Rochelson on behalf of Smith Drug Company and Direct Purchaser Class re #266 MOTION for Reargument re #262 Order (Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) and Local Civil Rule 7.1.5 for Reconsideration or Reargument Regarding the Court's February 9, 2023 Order Denying Plaintiffs (Averment of Counsel Pursuant to D. Del. Local Rules ;7.1.1; Proposed Order; and Certificate of Compliance) filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance)(Keener, Carmella)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 [SEALED] MOTION for Reargument re #262 Order (Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) and Local Civil Rule 7.1.5 for Reconsideration or Reargument Regarding the Court's February 9, 2023 Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel) - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Keener, Carmella)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) to Defendants filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Keener, Carmella)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REDACTED VERSION of #258 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Generic Manufacturers Other Than Handa) by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keener, Carmella)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Official Transcript of Discovery Conference held on February 9, 2023 before Chief Judge Connolly. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bonnie Archer, Email: Bonnie_Archer@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2023. (nmf)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #256 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Generic Manufacturers Other Than Handa). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/9/2023. (nmf)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Discovery Conference held on 2/9/2023. (Court Reporter Bonnie Archer.) (nmf)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean R. Roland on behalf of Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation (Roland, Dean)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 EXHIBIT re #258 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Generic Manufacturers Other Than Handa) by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Verification)(Keener, Carmella)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 [SEALED] MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Generic Manufacturers Other Than Handa) - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keener, Carmella)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Dispute on Discovery Related to Generic Manufacturers Other Than Handa. (Attachments: #1 Word Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Per Counsel's request, D.I. #255 has been placed under seal. (mpb)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Generic Manufacturers Other Than Handa) - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keener, Carmella)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION to Compel (Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Discovery Related to Generic Manufacturers Other Than Handa) - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Verification, #5 Certificate of Compliance)(Keener, Carmella)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected D.I. #255 & D.I. #256 spelling error per counsels' request. (vfm)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE OF SERVICE of subpoena duces tecum on Catalent Pharma Solutions, Inc. filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Keener, Carmella)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set per request of counsel for 2/9/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. (nmf)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Subpoena directed to Accord Healthcare, Inc. by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Subpoena)(Athey, J.)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE of Subpoena by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C to Notice of Subpoena)(Athey, J.)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to AstraZeneca's First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Keener, Carmella)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Retailer Plaintiffs Supplemental Objections and Responses to Astrazenecas First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Retailer Plaintiffs Supplemental Objections and Responses to Astrazenecas First Set of Requests for Admission filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam M. Steinfeld for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Service of EPP Supplemental Discovery Responses by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R (Avellino, Jason)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Amended Initial Disclosures and (2) Defendant Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Amended Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Second Supplemental Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Courtney A. Simmons - filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Silverstein, Alan)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #245 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Courtney A. Simmons, filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/3/2022. (kmd)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kyle S. Ruvolo for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Courtney A. Simmons for Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle S. Ruvolo on behalf of Smith Drug Company and the Direct Purchaser Class - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Keener, Carmella)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #244 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle S. Ruvolo on behalf of Smith Drug Company and the Direct Purchaser Class, filed by JM Smith Corporation. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/2/2022. (kmd)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #204 Amended Complaint, by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/25/2022. (nmf)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #234 MOTION to Resolve a Dispute on Proposed Protective Order for the reasons stated by the Court at the October 24, 2022 argument. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/25/2022. (nmf)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Discovery Conference held on 10/24/2022. (Court Reporter Bonnie Archer.) (nmf)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's First Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ralli on behalf of Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation (Ralli, Andrew)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake A. Bennett on behalf of Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation (Bennett, Blake)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Concerning the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Joyce, Alexandra)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #237 Stipulation Concerning the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/21/2022. (kmd)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Letter to The Hon. Colm F. Connolly from Carmella P. Keener regarding Dispute on Proposed Protective Order - re #235 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Keener, Carmella)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Defendants regarding Dispute on Proposed Protective Order - re #234 MOTION to Resolve a Dispute on Proposed Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Word Count Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION to Resolve a Dispute on Proposed Protective Order - filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Averment of Counsel)(Silver, Daniel)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: D.I. 234 previously deleted per counsels request. (apk)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to AstraZeneca's First Set of Interrogatories; (2) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Retailer Plaintiffs; and (3) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to AstraZeneca's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Keener, Carmella)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses & Objections to (1) Astrazenecas First Set of Requests of Interrogatories; (2) Defendants First Set of Requests for the Production; and (3) Astrazenecas First Set of Requests for Admission filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of End-Payor Plaintiffs Notice of Service of Discovery Responses by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R (Avellino, Jason)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Responses & Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of October 14, 2022 Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Keener, Carmella)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of AstraZeneca's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: D.I 228 previously deleted per counsel request. Counsel will refile. (lam)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE of Retailer Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.) Modified on 10/17/2022 (kmd).
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE of SERVICE -End-Payor Plaintiffs Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R (Avellino, Jason)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Retailer Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 SO ORDERED, re #221 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. Party Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund (on behalf of itself and all those similarly situated) terminated. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/14/2022. (nmf)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Avellino, Jason)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STATEMENT Defendants AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca LP, and AstraZeneca UK Limited's Disclosure of Citizenship and Certification of Diversity by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 SO ORDERED, re #217 Proposed Order re JOINT STIPULATION CONCERNING THE PROTOCOL FOR CONDUCTING REMOTE DEPOSITIONS, filed by JM Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/11/2022. (kmd)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Avellino on behalf of Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R (Avellino, Jason)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONCERNING THE PROTOCOL FOR CONDUCTING REMOTE DEPOSITIONS) by JM Smith Corporation. (Keener, Carmella)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set per request of counsel for 10/24/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. (nmf)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Silver, Daniel)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 7/28/2023. Expert Discovery due by 4/4/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2024. Answering Brief due 8/8/2024. Reply Brief due 10/7/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2025. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/23/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Jury Trial is set for 5/5/2025 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/23/2022. (nmf)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Waiver of Service, Motion to Dismiss, and Time to Respond to the Complaint by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Joyce, Alexandra)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #213 Stipulation Regarding Waiver of Service, Motion to Dismiss, and Time to Respond to the Complaint, filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Reset Answer Deadlines: AstraZeneca L P answer due 10/28/2022; AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P answer due 10/28/2022; AstraZeneca UK Limited answer due 10/28/2022; Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC answer due 10/28/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/22/2022. (kmd)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant AstraZeneca's Initial Disclosures; (2) AstraZeneca's First Set of Requests for Admission to All Plaintiffs; (3) AstraZeneca's First Set of Interrogatories to All Plaintiffs; (4) Defendants' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Retailer Plaintiffs; (5) Defendants' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to End-Payor Plaintiff filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Joyce, Alexandra)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Walgreens Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Athey, J.)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp..(Athey, J.)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE of Service of End -Payor Class Plaintiffs Initial disclosures by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc. (Barry, Michael)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; (2) Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Astrazeneca Defendants; and (3) Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Handa filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Keener, Carmella)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 9/14/2022. (Court Reporter Bonnie Archer.) Counsel to submit a revised proposed scheduling order to the Court on or before September 21, 2022. (nmf)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver, Esq.)(Silver, Daniel)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC- filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline version of First Amended Complaint)(Bennett, Blake)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Natalie F. Bennett for Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Samuel Ford for AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., and AstraZeneca UK Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(srs)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #203 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie Finkelman Bennett, filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/7/2022. (kmd)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Natalie Finkelman Bennett - filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund. (Barry, Michael)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Steinfeld on behalf of Smith Drug Company and the Direct Purchaser Class - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Keener, Carmella)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #202 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Steinfeld on behalf of Smith Drug Company and the Direct Purchaser Class, filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Hy-Vee, Inc., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid Corporation. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/31/2022. (kmd)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Monica L. Kiley, Esquire by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp. (Athey, J.)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/14/2022 at 02:00 PM Telephonically before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/23/2022. (nmf)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STATEMENT Answer to Walgreen Co, The Kroger Co., Albertsons Companies Inc., and H-E-B, L.P.'s Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STATEMENT Answer to Hy-Vee Inc.'s Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STATEMENT Answer to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Complaint filed by Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc. and H-E-B, L.P. by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Complaint filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc. by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Complaint filed by Hy-Vee Inc. by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STATEMENT Answer to Direct Purchaser's Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P. (Silver, Daniel)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #136 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STATEMENT Answer to CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation,& Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.'s Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #135 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Complaint filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, & Rite Aid HDQTRS. CORP. by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Silverstein, Alan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STATEMENT // Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.'s Statement Regarding Response to Complaints - by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Endo International plc and its debtor affiliates, including Defendant Par Pharmaceutical Inc. by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Michael)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David B. Rochelson for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Tiffany J. Cramer as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc. by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. (Cramer, Tiffany)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Julia R. McGrath for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re MOTIONS for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorneys #185 Christopher M. First and #184 David B. Rochelson, on behalf of Smith Drug Company and Direct Purchaser Class filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, JM Smith Corporation, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid Corporation. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/10/2022. (kmd)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher M. First on behalf of Smith Drug Company and Direct Purchaser Class - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Keener, Carmella)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David B. Rochelson on behalf of Smith Drug Company and Direct Purchaser Class - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Keener, Carmella)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julia R. McGrath on behalf of Smith Drug Company and Direct Purchaser Class - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Keener, Carmella)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew C. Curley on behalf of Smith Drug Company and Direct Purchaser Class - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Keener, Carmella)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew C. Curley for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re MOTIONS for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorneys #182 Andrew C. Curley and #183 Julia R. McGrath, on behalf of Smith Drug Company and Direct Purchaser Class filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, JM Smith Corporation, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Rite Aid Corporation. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/9/2022. (kmd)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (49 in 1:20-cv-01471-CFC, 81 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 42 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 181 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 93 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC, 39 in 1:20-cv-01470-CFC, 43 in 1:20-cv-01474-CFC, 38 in 1:20-cv-01473-CFC, 95 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 43 in 1:20-cv-01468-CFC, 39 in 1:20-cv-01472-CFC, 44 in 1:20-cv-01469-CFC, 163 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel Ford, filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., AstraZeneca,LP. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(kmd)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel Ford - filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca,LP, Astrazeneca L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Samuel Ford)(Joyce, Alexandra)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 SO ORDERED, re #179 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints to August 18, 2022, filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Reset Answer Deadlines: AstraZeneca L P answer due 8/18/2022; AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P answer due 8/18/2022; AstraZeneca UK Limited answer due 8/18/2022; Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC answer due 8/18/2022; Par Pharmaceutical Inc. answer due 8/18/2022. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/11/2022. (kmd)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints to August 18, 2022 - filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Joyce, Alexandra)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #137 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part #139 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part #141 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/5/2022. (nmf)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/5/2022. (nmf)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Michael P. Kelly as co-counsel.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Official Transcript of Motion to Dismiss held on May 10, 2022 before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bonnie Archer,Email: bonnie_archer@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2022. (Archer, Bonnie)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Oral Argument held on 5/10/2022. (Court Reporter Bonnie Archer.) (nmf)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STATEMENT Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.2(B) by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Oppositions to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R re #148 Answering Brief in Opposition, #150 Answering Brief in Opposition,,, #147 Answering Brief in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Athey, J.)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alexandra M. Joyce (Joyce, Alexandra)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael S. Tarringer for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #170 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chad B. Holtzman, filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/22/2022. (kmd)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chad B. Holtzman - filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Barry, Michael)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Tarringer - filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Cramer, Tiffany)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (90 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC, 169 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Tarringer, filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/13/2022. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01201-CFC(kmd)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STATEMENT re #166 Notice (Other),,, Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.2(B) by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver regarding Request to Reschedule Oral Argument Hearing - re Oral Order, Set Hearings. (Silver, Daniel)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Re-Setting Hearings: The Oral Argument is rescheduled per unopposed request of counsel for 5/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/6/2022. (nmf)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Hearings( An Oral Argument is set for 4/12/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/4/2022. (nmf)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter R Kohn for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Oppositions to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, H-E-B, L.P., Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R re #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keener, Carmella)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE for Deborah A. Elman to Withdraw as Attorney - filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Barry, Michael) Modified on 1/20/2022 (kmd).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Richard Silverstein on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Silverstein, Alan)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re JM Smith Corporation : Entry of appearance of attorney Carmella P. Keener. Attorney Michael D. Van Gorder terminated. (Keener, Carmella)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of the Withdrawal of Brandon R. Harper as Counsel of Record by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Connolly, Arthur)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Connolly, Arthur)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STATEMENT re #159 Notice (Other),,, Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.2(B) by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R re #148 Answering Brief in Opposition, #150 Answering Brief in Opposition,,, #147 Answering Brief in Opposition, (to Motions to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opinion - Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, et al. v. Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd., et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Impax Laboratories, Inc. v. FTC)(Barry, Michael)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation and Email Address by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund (Barry, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chris Letter, Amanda Hass, Dan Chiorean, and Stuart Des Roches for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 REQUEST for Oral Argument by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Hy-Vee, Inc., JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, The Kroger Co., Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Walgreen Co., Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R re #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #137 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Van Gorder, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 REPLY BRIEF re #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #137 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 REPLY BRIEF re #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the End-Payor Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Silver, Daniel)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY BRIEF re #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #137 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in support of Defendants Motions to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Retailer Plaintiffs Amended Complaints filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Silver, Daniel)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Joseph N. Roda, Michael L. Roberts, Stephanie E. Smith for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter Safirstein for Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 SO ORDERED, re #152 Stipulation filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/19/2021. (fms)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidated Reply Briefs In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas J. Maas for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Dianne M. Nast and Michael D. Ford for KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 DECLARATION re #148 Answering Brief in Opposition by JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #137 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Barry, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Word Count Certification by JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. re #148 Answering Brief in Opposition (Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #137 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2021. (Van Gorder, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (All Retailer Plaintiff Actions) filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Athey, J.)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. Roberts and Stephanie Egner Smith - filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Cramer, Tiffany)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (146 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 89 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. Roberts and Stephanie Egner Smith filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/8/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01201-CFC(fms)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Lee Albert and Brian D. Brooks for Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association and Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC.(kmd)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dianne M. Nast, Joseph N. Roda, and Michael D. Ford - filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Cramer, Tiffany)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #145 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dianne M. Nast, Joseph N. Roda, and Michael D. Ford filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/28/2021. (fms)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Supplemental OPENING BRIEF in Support re #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Accord Healthcare Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hoeschen, Nathan)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 EXHIBIT re #142 Opening Brief in Support, #140 Opening Brief in Support, #138 Opening Brief in Support, 1-11 by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Word Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Word Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-C, #2 Word Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Word Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #137 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Word Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Word Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Class Action) against AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc.- filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund.(Barry, Michael)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc.- filed by JM Smith Corporation, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc..(Van Gorder, Michael)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION AND COORDINATION OF CERTAIN CASES, CONSOLIDATION OF DOCKETS AND BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' OPERATIVE COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher T. Stow-Serge as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer associated with Odom & Des Roches, LLC. (Van Gorder, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from J. Clayton Athey, Esq. regarding Coordination and Consolidation of pending cases. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit B3, #6 Exhibit B4)(Athey, J.)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher,Akhil K. Gola for AstraZeneca LP AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. and AstraZeneca UK Limited. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01470-CFC et al.(mal)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erin R. Leger,Susan C. Segura and Erin R. Leger for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of PLAINTIFF KPH'S SUR-SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KPH'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cramer, Tiffany)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DECLARATION re #129 Notice (Other), Declaration of Michael Van Gorder in Support of Sur-reply in Further Opposition to KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Motion for Appointment of Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Van Gorder, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Sur-reply in Further Opposition to KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Motion for Appointment of Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class by JM Smith Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Van Gorder, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. KPH's Motion for Appointment of Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class (No. 20-cv-1201-CFC, D.I. 48) is DENIED, and J M Smith's Motion for Appointment of Garwin Gerstein & Fisher LLP as Interim Lead Counsel (No. 20-cv-1076-CFC, D.I. 60) is GRANTED. 2. The Court appoints Garwin Gerstein & Fisher LLP as sole interim lead counsel for the proposed class of Direct Purchasers ("Lead Counsel"). Lead Counsel may act on behalf of the proposed class and plaintiffs in all Direct Purchaser actions.Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01201-CFC(nmf)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #122 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Sur-Reply filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., granting #121 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-reply in Further Opposition to KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Motion for Appointment of Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class and Cross Motion for Consolidation of All Direct Purchaser filed by JM Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2020. (nmf)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #126 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susan C. Segura filed by JM Smith Corporation, #125 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin R. Leger filed by JM Smith Corporation, #124 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David C. Raphael, Jr. filed by JM Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2020. (fms)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (33 in 1:20-cv-01470-CFC, 38 in 1:20-cv-01469-CFC, 76 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 43 in 1:20-cv-01471-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01473-CFC, 90 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 33 in 1:20-cv-01472-CFC, 155 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01474-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01468-CFC, 127 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., AstraZeneca,LP. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola - filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca,LP, Astrazeneca L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola)(Silver, Daniel)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susan C. Segura - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin R. Leger - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David C. Raphael, Jr. - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of of Lodging letters to the Court from legal counsel to McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation and Cardinal Health, Inc. by JM Smith Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Van Gorder, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Telephone Conference held on 11/12/2020. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al. Counsel to submit proposed orders to the Court.(nmf)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Sur-Reply - filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Cramer, Tiffany)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-reply in Further Opposition to KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Motion for Appointment of Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class and Cross Motion for Consolidation of All Direct Purchaser Cases - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Van Gorder, Michael)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Plaintiffs to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/12/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/2/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brett J. Williamson for Par Pharmaceutical Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases:20-1076 (CFC), 20-1086 (CFC), 20-1087 (CFC), 20-1089 (CFC), 20-1090 (CFC), 20-1021 (CFC). (myr)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Brett J. Williamson and Stephen J. McIntyre for Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(kmd)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Maas - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart E. Des Roches - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dan Chiorean - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Stow-Serge - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chris Letter - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda Hass - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #117 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Stow-Serge filed by JM Smith Corporation, #115 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda Hass filed by JM Smith Corporation, #119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart E. Des Roches filed by JM Smith Corporation, #118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dan Chiorean filed by JM Smith Corporation, #120 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Maas filed by JM Smith Corporation, #116 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chris Letter filed by JM Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/20/2020. (nmf)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Joint STATUS REPORT AND STATEMENT OF PENDING MATTERS WHICH REQUIRE JUDICIAL ATTENTION by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (113 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC, 74 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 153 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 35 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 88 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP - filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: On or before October 8, 2020, the parties shall confer and file a single combined status report regarding the related cases. STATUS REPORT ORDER:( Status Report due by 10/8/2020.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Russell A. Chorush for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter Kohn for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph T. Lukens for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David F. Sorensen for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Daniel Litvin, Joseph Opper, Kimberly M. Hennings, Bruce E. Gerstein for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Caitlin G. Coslett for JM Smith Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. Sorensen - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Caitlin G. Coslett - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #108 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kimberly M. Hennings filed by JM Smith Corporation, #106 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dan Litvin filed by JM Smith Corporation, #107 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph Opper filed by JM Smith Corporation, #109 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce E. Gerstein filed by JM Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/16/2020. (nmf)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. Sorensen filed by JM Smith Corporation, #110 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Caitlin G. Coslett filed by JM Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/16/2020. (nmf)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce E. Gerstein - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kimberly M. Hennings - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph Opper - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dan Litvin - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #103 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter R. Kohn filed by JM Smith Corporation, #104 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph T. Lukens filed by JM Smith Corporation, #105 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Russell A. Chorush filed by JM Smith Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/14/2020. (nmf)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Russell A. Chorush - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Russell A. Chorush)(Van Gorder, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph T. Lukens - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter R. Kohn - filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Van Gorder on behalf of JM Smith Corporation (Van Gorder, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney James E. Gallagher for Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Marino for Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin M. Greenblum, and John E. Schmidtlein for AstraZeneca L.P., for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., and for AstraZeneca UK Limited, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(sam)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Marino & James E. Gallagher - filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Connolly, Arthur)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (69 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 140 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 100 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 30 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 83 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #101 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Marino & James E. Gallagher filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. (fms)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor - filed by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor)(Silver, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Garwin Gerstein & Fisher, L.L.P. (unable to forward) re D.I. #92 . Resent to address found on firm's website: 88 Pine Street, 10th Floor, New York, NY 10005. (kmd)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Ryan Harper on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Harper, Brandon)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Riley on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Riley, Stephanie)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Connolly, Arthur)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC (rjb)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Silver, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited (Kelly, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/17/2020. (kmd)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-07233. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file.
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Delaware. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER granting #68 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendants' motion to transfer the case to the District of Delaware is GRANTED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a "written opinion." The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. No. 68, and transfer the case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/11/2020) (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Memorandum in Opposition to KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Motion for Appointment of Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class and Cross Motion for Consolidation of All Direct Purchaser Cases re: #88 Memo Endorsement,. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly Hennings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Certificate of Service).(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #87 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Kimberly Hennings dated 7/8/2020 Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: JM Smith may certainly file an opposition to KPHs motion. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/8/2020) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Kimberly Hennings dated 7/8/2020 Document filed by JM Smith Corporation..(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Smith, Allison) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority re: #84 Notice (Other),. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: (68 in 1:19-cv-07233-CM) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer.. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc., Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM, 1:19-cv-10049-CM(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Kimberly Hennings dated 12/23/2019 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer. . Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #69 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). . Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-07233-CM; granting (18) Motion for Caitlin V. McHugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09999-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-07233-CM; granting (17) Motion for Chelsea M. Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09999-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 16 in 19cv9999 Motion for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #76 Notice of Withdrawral filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC ENDORSEMENT: OK. Attorney Craig Seebald; Laurel Sage Fensterstock and Jason Alan Levine terminated. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/13/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Representation. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Levine, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #69 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). . Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECLARATION of Dan Litvin in Opposition re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer.. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Litvin, Dan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer. . Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John E. Schmidtlein dated November 11, 2019 re: Seroquel XR U.S. Sales in 2011. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited.(Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Proposed Schedule, #2 Exhibit B-Defendants' Proposed Schedule, #3 Exhibit C-Comparison Of The Parties' Schedules)(Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of C. Connor, #4 Exhibit)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit C. Connor Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Schock on behalf of PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Schock, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AS FOLLOWS: 1. Defendants will respond to the Complaint in the DPP Action on October 31, 2019. 2. If Defendants respond to the Complaint by filing a motion to dismiss, DPPs will file an opposition brief by November 27, 2019 and Defendants will file a reply brief on December 19, 2019. 3. Defendants reserve all rights to seek a stay of discovery pending resolution of any dispositive motion directed at the Complaint. DPPs reserve all rights to oppose any such stay of discovery. 4. This Stipulation is entered into without prejudice to any party seeking any interim relief. AstraZeneca L P answer due 10/31/2019; AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P answer due 10/31/2019; Astrazeneca UK Limited answer due 10/31/2019; Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 10/31/2019; PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. answer due 10/31/2019. (Motions due by 10/31/2019. Responses due by 11/27/2019. Replies due by 12/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/2/2019) (mml) Modified on 10/2/2019 (mml). Modified on 11/8/2019 (mml). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #61 Motion for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/2/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #62 Motion for James E. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court as subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/2/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for James E. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17696823. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificates, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gallagher, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SECOND MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing--DC, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing--VA)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Colette Tyrrell Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632329. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff. in support of Pro Hac, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate Good Standing, #3 Exhibit VA Certificate Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Connor, Colette) Modified on 9/20/2019 (wb). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #56 Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/28/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #55 Motion for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/27/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17494569. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PHV Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit California Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit District of Columbia Cert. of Good Standing)(Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. Related Document Number: #52 . (Kohn, Peter) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/26/2019 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Peter R. Kohn in Support re: #52 MOTION for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17491082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kohn, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2019 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Peter R. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17491082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Kohn, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2019 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Williamson, Brett) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Handa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Marino, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT: 1. Subject to the Court's entry of this Stipulation, each undersigned counsel agrees, on behalf of the below-identified defendant that they represent (collectively, the "Signatory Defendants"), to accept service of the Complaint to the extent that such service has not previously been accomplished. Except as to service of process, Signatory Defendants expressly reserve the right to challenge the Complaint on any-and-all grounds, including personal jurisdiction. 2. The time for Signatory Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended until October 11, 2019. 3. Signatory Defendants reserve all rights to seek a stay of discovery pending resolution of any dispositive motions directed at the Complaint. Plaintiffs reserve all rights to oppose any such stay of discovery. 4. This Stipulation is entered into without prejudice to any party seeking any interim relief. AstraZeneca L P answer due 10/11/2019; AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P answer due 10/11/2019; Astrazeneca UK Limited answer due 10/11/2019; Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 10/11/2019; PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. answer due 10/11/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #40 Motion for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #41 Motion for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #42 Motion for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Astrazeneca PLC for AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Document filed by AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited.(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17474111. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison B. Smith, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Allison) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17473918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntyre, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17473617. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Marino on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Marino, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #31 Motion for Jason A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #34 Motion for Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #30 Motion for Caitlin G. Coslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Seebald on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Seebald, Craig) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17459119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig P. Seebald in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - D.C., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Seebald, Craig) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurel Sage Fensterstock on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Fensterstock, Laurel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Alan Levine on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Levine, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Jason A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17454546. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - D.C., #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Levine, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Caitlin G. Coslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17451669. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coslett, Caitlin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of (Amended Notice of Appearance) re: #28 Notice of Appearance. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Williamson, Brett) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #23 Motion for David Francis Sorensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/16/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby, ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel receiving this order shall contact all counsel of record or where a party is not yet represented, such party) and, if necessary, provide them with a copy of this order. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must appear for a conference on 11/8/2019 in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York I 0007 at 10:00 a.m. (as further set forth in this Order). SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/15/2019) (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for David Francis Sorensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17436037. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorensen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service was accepted by C.J. Mou, Authorized Agent. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was accepted by Mary Jean Celestino, Receptionist. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. AstraZeneca L P served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Opper on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Opper, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dan Litvin on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Litvin, Dan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aakruti Govind Vakharia on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Vakharia, Aakruti) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce E. Gerstein on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Gerstein, Bruce) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Marion Hennings on behalf of JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca UK Limited. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca L P. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Par Pharmaceutical Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca UK Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by JM Smith Corporation.(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Seroquel XR (Extended Release Quetiapine Fumarate) Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Stephen J. McIntyre
Represented By: Brett J. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Represented By: Samuel Ford
Represented By: Elise M. Baumgarten
Represented By: Simon A. Latcovich
Represented By: Anna Searle
Represented By: Elizabeth Peled
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Marino
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Represented By: James E. Gallagher
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Courtney A. Simmons
Represented By: Dillon M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Represented By: Samuel Ford
Represented By: Simon A. Latcovich
Represented By: Elise M. Baumgarten
Represented By: Anna Searle
Represented By: Elizabeth Peled
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca L P
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Represented By: Samuel Ford
Represented By: Elise M. Baumgarten
Represented By: Simon A. Latcovich
Represented By: Anna Searle
Represented By: Elizabeth Peled
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Lang
Represented By: Christina E. Fahmy
Represented By: Peter M. Boyle
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM Smith Corporation on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated doing business as Smith Drug Company
Represented By: Joseph Opper
Represented By: David F. Sorensen
Represented By: Russell A. Chorush
Represented By: Kimberly M. Hennings
Represented By: Peter Kohn
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Represented By: Caitlin G. Coslett
Represented By: Daniel Litvin
Represented By: Bruce E. Gerstein
Represented By: Joseph T. Lukens
Represented By: Erin R. Leger
Represented By: Amanda Hass
Represented By: Susan C. Segura
Represented By: Chris Letter
Represented By: Stuart Des Roches
Represented By: Thomas J. Maas
Represented By: Dan Chiorean
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Peter R Kohn
Represented By: Andrew C. Curley
Represented By: David B. Rochelson
Represented By: Julia R. McGrath
Represented By: Kyle S. Ruvolo
Represented By: Adam M. Steinfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Roberts
Represented By: Michael D. Ford
Represented By: Stephanie E. Smith
Represented By: Joseph N. Roda
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Represented By: Robert J. Kriner, Jr.
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: Michael S. Tarringer
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Tiffany C Hayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Brian D. Brooks
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Jason Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-E-B, L.P.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Deborah A. Elman
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Jason Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Jason Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund
Represented By: Heidi M. Silton
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Jessica N. Servais
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Jason Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Brian D. Brooks
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Jason Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinney Drugs, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Roberts
Represented By: Michael D. Ford
Represented By: Stephanie E. Smith
Represented By: Joseph N. Roda
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Represented By: Robert J. Kriner, Jr.
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: Michael S. Tarringer
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Tiffany C Hayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson
Represented By: Archana Tamoshunas
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Jason Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Natalie F. Bennett
Represented By: Jason Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Peter Safirstein
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Jason Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Ralli
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?