Purdy v. Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Sandra Purdy
Defendant: Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01077
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint to October 26, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. answer due 10/26/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/13/2020. (dlw)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint to October 26, 2020 - filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.. (Wheatley, Emily)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint to October 12, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. answer due 10/12/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/10/2020. (dlw)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint to October 12, 2020 - filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.. (Wheatley, Emily)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ari Marcus, Esq filed by Sandra Purdy. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/27/2020. (dlw)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibit & Civil Cover Sheet served on Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD. c/o The Corporation Trust Co. on 8/20/2020, filed by Sandra Purdy. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ari Marcus, Esq - filed by Sandra Purdy. (Garibian, Antranig)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3137614.) - filed by Sandra Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purdy v. Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Purdy
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: Emily Wheatley
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?