Gilmore v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Scott Gilmore
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01085
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joel Oster filed by Scott Gilmore. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/5/2020. (dlw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joel Oster - filed by Scott Gilmore. (Williams, Chandra)
September 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John J. Rosenthal for Monsanto Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeff Wilkerson for Monsanto Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John J. Rosenthal and Jeff Wilkerson filed by Monsanto Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/8/2020. (dlw)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 19, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Monsanto Company answer due 10/19/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/8/2020. (dlw)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John J. Rosenthal and Jeff Wilkerson - filed by Monsanto Company. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 19, 2020 - filed by Monsanto Company. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gillian L. Wade, Esq.; Sara D. Avila, Esq. and Marc A. Castaneda, Esq. filed by Scott Gilmore. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/27/2020. (dlw)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Scott Gilmore. Monsanto Company served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Williams, Chandra)
August 19, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Counsel improperly filed summons to be issued at D.I. 3. This docket entry has since been deleted. (kmd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gillian L. Wade, Esq.; Sara D. Avila, Esq. and Marc A. Castaneda, Esq. - filed by Scott Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificates of Gillian L. Wade, Esq; Sara D. Avila, Esq and Marc A. Castaneda, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Williams, Chandra)
August 19, 2020 No Summons Issued. (myr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3140065.) - filed by Scott Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Gilmore
Represented By: Chandra Joan Williams
Represented By: William J. Rhodunda, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jeff Wilkerson
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?