CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Rite Aid Corporation
Defendant: AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, Accord Healthcare Inc. and Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01086
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 89 Joint STATUS REPORT AND STATEMENT OF PENDING MATTERS WHICH REQUIRE JUDICIAL ATTENTION by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (113 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC, 74 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 153 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 35 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 88 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
October 6, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP - filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: On or before October 8, 2020, the parties shall confer and file a single combined status report regarding the related cases. STATUS REPORT ORDER:( Status Report due by 10/8/2020.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas J. Lang for Accord Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC (myr)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle for Accord Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC(kmd)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (72 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 33 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 144 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 86 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle filed by Accord Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (85 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 143 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Lang filed by Accord Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 8, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin M. Greenblum, and John E. Schmidtlein for AstraZeneca L.P., for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., and for AstraZeneca UK Limited, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(sam)
September 4, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Lang - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander J. Egervary for CVS Pharmacy, Inc., for Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Monica L. Kiley for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.,for Rite Aid Corporation, for Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Barry L. Refsin for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.,for Rite Aid Corporation, for Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (69 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 140 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 100 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 30 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 83 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Caitlin V. McHugh for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.,for Rite Aid Corporation, for Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 2, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Shaw on behalf of Accord Healthcare Inc., Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Shaw, John)
September 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric L. Bloom for CVS Pharmacy, Inc., for Rite Aid Corporation, for Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 2, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor - filed by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor)(Silver, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barry L. Refsin, Monica L. Kiley, Eric L. Bloom, Alexander J. Egervary, and Caitlin V. McHugh filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp., Rite Aid Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/2/2020. (fms)
September 1, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barry L. Refsin, Monica L. Kiley, Eric L. Bloom, Alexander J. Egervary, and Caitlin V. McHugh - filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp.. (Athey, J.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Clayton Athey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Ryan Harper on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Harper, Brandon)
August 26, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Riley on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Riley, Stephanie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Connolly, Arthur)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC (rjb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 25, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Kelly, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Silver, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 74 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/18/2020. (sam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 73 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-09999. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 12, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Delaware. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER granting #29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #34 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #34 Motion to Transfer Case. Defendants' motions to transfer the case to the District of Delaware are GRANTED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a "written opinion." The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motions at CVS Dkt. Nos. 29 and 34, Walgreen Dkt. Nos. 12 and 18 from the court's list of open motions; and transfer all three cases to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Proposed Redactions of Exhibits A-C (ECF 70) re: #69 LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, and C addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Benjamin Greenblum dated July 31, 2020., #68 Letter, 70 Redacted Document,. Document filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J).(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 69 LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, and C addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Benjamin Greenblum dated July 31, 2020. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin M. Greenblum).(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Samantha Southall dated July 31, 2020 re: Order of July 30, 2020 (ECF No. 67). Document filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation..(Southall, Samantha) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 67 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to All parties in the above captioned matters:from Chief Judge Colleen McMahon dated 7/30/2020 re: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al.(19-cv-9999-CM); Walgreen Co. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al. (19-cv-10049-CM); Hy-Vee, Inc. v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al. (20-cv-4483-CM) ENDORSEMENT: In their motion papers, the parties reference certain inventory management agreements dated April 1, 2016 between Defendants AstraZeneca LP and AstraZeneca Pharmaceutical LP and each of the Retailer Plaintiffs' assignors: AmerisourceBergen Corporation (through its operating subsidiaries, including AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation); Cardinal Health, Inc. (through its operating affiliates); and McKesson Corporation. I cannot seem to find copies of those agreements in the record. Please file these agreements on ECF immediately.Thank you all for your prompt response to this inquiry. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/30/2020) (js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF HAYNES AND BOONE, LLP: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Haynes and Boone, LLP's motion for withdrawal from the above-captioned matter is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that attorney William Feldman is terminated as counsel of record for Accord Healthcare, Inc.; and it is further ORDERED that the Court's clerk shall turn off the electronic notification for attorney William Feldman, and those associated with his appearance, in connection with the above-captioned matter. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/18/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 65 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #63 MOTION for William Feldman to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted. Kilpatrick should file motion of appearance. Attorney William Feldman terminated. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/18/2020) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 64 AFFIRMATION of William Feldman in Support re: #63 MOTION for William Feldman to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc...(Feldman, William) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for William Feldman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Feldman, William) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney William Feldman to RE-FILE Document #62 MOTION for William Feldman to Withdraw as Attorney . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 62 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William Feldman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of William Feldman, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Feldman, William) Modified on 5/13/2020 (db). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas J. Lang on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc.. New Address: Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP, 607 14th Street, NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC, USA 20005-2018, 202-508-5830..(Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Smith, Allison) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: (68 in 1:19-cv-07233-CM) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer.. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc., Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM, 1:19-cv-10049-CM(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #51 Motion for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/21/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #49 Motion for Colette Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #50 Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #52 Motion for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #53 Motion for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18509936. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18509936. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntyre, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18509710. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #51 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18508289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18509710. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison B. Smith, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Allison) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18508289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 MOTION for Colette Tyrrell Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18503979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #50 MOTION for John Edward Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18504150. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for John Edward Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18504150. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Schmidtlein, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing)(Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Colette Tyrrell Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18503979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of C. Connor, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Counsel PHV, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit VA Certificate of Good Standing)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 47 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Astrazeneca PLC for Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited.(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 46 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADMITTING CHRISTINA ELYSE FAHMY PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/2020) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADMITTING PETER MICHAEL BOYLE PRO HAC VICE granting #26 Motion for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/2020) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Marino on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Marino, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ., #28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). . Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Accord Product List)(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Handa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Gallagher, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Edward Gallagher on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Gallagher, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Colette T. Connor in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative., MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Williamson, Brett) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18344706. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #26 MOTION for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18335856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18344706. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C. Fahmy in support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Affidavit of Service)(Brandofino, Keith) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18335856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Brandofino, Keith) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-07233-CM; granting (18) Motion for Caitlin V. McHugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09999-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-07233-CM; granting (17) Motion for Chelsea M. Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09999-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #16 Motion for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. for Accord Healthcare, Inc.. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc..(Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Feldman on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Feldman, William) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Lang on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Lang on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Chelsea M. Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #16 MOTION for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #18 MOTION for Caitlin V. McHugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129577. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Caitlin V. McHugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129577. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(McHugh, Caitlin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Chelsea M. Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Chelsea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Refsin, Barry) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 8, 2019 CASE ASSOCIATED: Create association to 1:19-cv-07233-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/08/2019) (NAP) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric L Bloom on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Bloom, Eric) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Monica L Kiley on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Kiley, Monica) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Eric L. Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/5/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Monica L. Kiley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/5/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca L.P. waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Astrazeneca UK Limited waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Accord Healthcare, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Eric L. Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17889957. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Eric L. Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17889957. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric L. Bloom, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloom, Eric) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Monica L. Kiley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17889566. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Monica L. Kiley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17889566. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Monica L. Kiley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiley, Monica) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,.(Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-8296 (CM). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,.(Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-7233 (CM). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,.(Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17851562)Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,, Rite Aid Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Egervary, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca L.P.
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca UK Limited
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Christina E. Fahmy
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Thomas J. Lang
Represented By: Peter M. Boyle
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp.
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?