Walgreen Co. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al
Plaintiff: H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. and ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.
Defendant: AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Accord Healthcare Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01087
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 75 Joint STATUS REPORT AND STATEMENT OF PENDING MATTERS WHICH REQUIRE JUDICIAL ATTENTION by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (113 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC, 74 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 153 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 35 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 88 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
October 6, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP - filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: On or before October 8, 2020, the parties shall confer and file a single combined status report regarding the related cases. STATUS REPORT ORDER:( Status Report due by 10/8/2020.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas J. Lang for Accord Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC (myr)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle for Accord Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC(kmd)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (72 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 33 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 144 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 86 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle filed by Accord Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (85 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 143 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Lang filed by Accord Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 8, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin M. Greenblum, and John E. Schmidtlein for AstraZeneca L.P., for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., and for AstraZeneca UK Limited, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(sam)
September 4, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Lang - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anna T. Neill for ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., for H-E-B, L.P., for The Kroger Co., for Walgreen Co. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott E. Perwin for ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., for H-E-B, L.P.,for The Kroger Co., for Walgreen Co. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren C. Ravkind for ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.,for H-E-B, L.P., for The Kroger Co., for Walgreen Co. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (69 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 140 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 100 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 30 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 83 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 2, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Shaw on behalf of Accord Healthcare Inc., Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Shaw, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor - filed by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor)(Silver, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott E. Perwin, Lauren C. Ravkind and Anna T. Neill filed by The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co., ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/2/2020. (fms)
September 1, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott E. Perwin, Lauren C. Ravkind and Anna T. Neill - filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Athey, J.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Clayton Athey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Ryan Harper on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Harper, Brandon)
August 26, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Riley on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Riley, Stephanie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Connolly, Arthur)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC (rjb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 25, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Kelly, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Silver, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 60 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/18/2020. (mal)
August 19, 2020 Filing 59 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-10049. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file with documents numbered 1 - 58 attached
August 12, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Delaware. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #12 Motion to Transfer Case; granting #18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendants' motions to transfer the case to the District of Delaware are GRANTED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a "written opinion." The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motions at CVS Dkt. Nos. 29 and 34, Walgreen Dkt. Nos. 12 and 18 from the court's list of open motions; and transfer all three cases to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 57 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to All parties in the above captioned matters:from Chief Judge Colleen McMahon dated 7/30/2020 re: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al.(19-cv-9999-CM); Walgreen Co. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al. (19-cv-10049-CM); Hy-Vee, Inc. v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al. (20-cv-4483-CM) ENDORSEMENT: In their motion papers, the parties reference certain inventory management agreements dated April 1, 2016 between Defendants AstraZeneca LP and AstraZeneca Pharmaceutical LP and each of the Retailer Plaintiffs' assignors: AmerisourceBergen Corporation (through its operating subsidiaries, including AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation); Cardinal Health, Inc. (through its operating affiliates); and McKesson Corporation. I cannot seem to find copies of those agreements in the record. Please file these agreements on ECF immediately.Thank you all for your prompt response to this inquiry. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/30/2020) (js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Smith, Allison) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christina Fahmy on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc...(Fahmy, Christina) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: (68 in 1:19-cv-07233-CM) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer.. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc., Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM, 1:19-cv-10049-CM(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #37 Motion for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/21/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Michael Boyle on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Boyle, Peter) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #40 Motion for Anna T. Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #39 Motion for Lauren C. Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #42 Motion for Colette Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #44 Motion for Richard Alan Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #41 Motion for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #43 Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #44 MOTION for Richard Alan Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18512600. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Richard Alan Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18512600. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Richard Alan Arnold, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Arnold, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for Lauren Carol Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #41 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18502741. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #40 MOTION for Anna Theresa Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #38 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18502265. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #43 MOTION for John Edward Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18504224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #42 MOTION for Colette Tyrrell Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18504050. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for John Edward Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18504224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Schmidtlein, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing)(Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Colette Tyrrell Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18504050. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of C. Connor, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit VA Certificate of Good Standing)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18502741. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre, #2 CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 [Proposed] Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(McIntyre, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Anna Theresa Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Neill, Anna) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Lauren Carol Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ravkind, Lauren) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18502265. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison B. Smith, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 [Proposed] Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Smith, Allison) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #36 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac vice,,, Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice., #35 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac vice,,, Corrected Motion for Admission Appear Pro Hac Vice... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the motion;. Re-file the motion using the event type Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice found under the event list Motions - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18501889. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18501889. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw, #2 CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 [Proposed] Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Bradshaw, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 36 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac vice,,, Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Neill, Anna) Modified on 1/14/2020 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 35 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac vice,,, Corrected Motion for Admission Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ravkind, Lauren) Modified on 1/14/2020 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #33 MOTION for Lauren Carol Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18500982. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #34 MOTION for Anna Theresa Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18501433. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 34 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Anna Theresa Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18501433. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and supporting Certificate of Good Standing)(Neill, Anna) Modified on 1/14/2020 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Lauren Carol Ravkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18500982. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing)(Ravkind, Lauren) Modified on 1/14/2020 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Brandofino, Keith) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Astrazeneca PLC for Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited.(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADMITTING PETER MICHAEL BOYLE PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/2020) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADMITTING CHRISTINA ELYSE FAHMY PRO HAC VICE granting #16 Motion for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/2020) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Marino on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Marino, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Accord Product List)(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE #26 Memorandum in Opposition) - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Accord Product List)(Perwin, Scott) Modified on 1/7/2020 (db). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Handa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Gallagher, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Edward Gallagher on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Gallagher, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #20 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348908. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #15 MOTION for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348799. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. Related Document Number: #18 . (Brandofino, Keith) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Brandofino, Keith) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc..(Brandofino, Keith) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. for Accord Healthcare, Inc.. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc..(Brandofino, Keith) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348908. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C. Fahmy in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Affidavit of Service)(Brandofino, Keith) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348799. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of P. Boyle in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Affidavit of Service)(Brandofino, Keith) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Colette T. Connor in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative., MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Williamson, Brett) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 8, 2019 CASE ASSOCIATED: Create association to 1:19-cv-07233-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/08/2019) (NAP) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Barton Gray on behalf of Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Gray, Joshua) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Eliot Perwin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Albertsons Companies, Inc.; Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P; Astrazeneca L.P.; Astrazeneca UK Limited; Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Eliot Perwin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amended. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amended. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Attachment 2)(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17860862. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17860862. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attachment 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order attachment 2)(Perwin, Scott) Modified on 10/30/2019 (aea). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-08712-CM, 1:19-cv-09036-CM, 1:19-cv-09999. Document filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA L.P., ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, L.P., ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, Accord Healthcare, Inc., HANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17860544)Document filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., The Kroger Co., H-E-B, L.P., Walgreen Co..(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walgreen Co. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-E-B, L.P.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca L.P.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: Peter M. Boyle
Represented By: Christina E. Fahmy
Represented By: Thomas J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?