Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Plaintiff: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Accord Healthcare Inc. and Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01089
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 36 Joint STATUS REPORT AND STATEMENT OF PENDING MATTERS WHICH REQUIRE JUDICIAL ATTENTION by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (113 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC, 74 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 153 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 35 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 88 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
October 6, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP - filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: On or before October 8, 2020, the parties shall confer and file a single combined status report regarding the related cases. STATUS REPORT ORDER:( Status Report due by 10/8/2020.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas J. Lang for Accord Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers.Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC (myr)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle for Accord Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC(kmd)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (72 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 33 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 144 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 86 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle filed by Accord Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (85 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 143 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Lang filed by Accord Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin M. Greenblum, and John E. Schmidtlein for AstraZeneca L.P., for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., and for AstraZeneca UK Limited, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(sam)
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Lang - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anna T. Neill for Hy-Vee, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott E. Perwin for Hy-Vee, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren C. Ravkind for Hy-Vee, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (69 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 140 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 100 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 30 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 83 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Shaw on behalf of Accord Healthcare Inc., Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Shaw, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor - filed by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor)(Silver, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott E. Perwin, Lauren C. Ravkind and Anna T. Neill filed by Hy-Vee, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/2/2020. (fms)
September 1, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott E. Perwin, Lauren C. Ravkind and Anna T. Neill - filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Athey, J.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Clayton Athey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Athey, J.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Ryan Harper on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Harper, Brandon)
August 26, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Riley on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Riley, Stephanie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Connolly, Arthur)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC (rjb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 25, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Kelly, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Silver, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/18/2020. (myr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:20-cv-04483. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 12, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Delaware. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER: Defendants' motions to transfer the case to the District of Delaware are GRANTED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a "written opinion." The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motions at CVS Dkt. Nos. 29 and 34, Walgreen Dkt. Nos. 12 and 18 from the courts list of open motions; and transfer all three cases to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) (rj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #16 Motion for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit not notarized. Please re-file entire motion and make sure your affidavit is notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PHV Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Connor, Colette) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Schmidtlein, John) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to All parties in the above captioned matters:from Chief Judge Colleen McMahon dated 7/30/2020 re: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al.(19-cv-9999-CM); Walgreen Co. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al. (19-cv-10049-CM); Hy-Vee, Inc. v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al. (20-cv-4483-CM) ENDORSEMENT: In their motion papers, the parties reference certain inventory management agreements dated April 1, 2016 between Defendants AstraZeneca LP and AstraZeneca Pharmaceutical LP and each of the Retailer Plaintiffs' assignors: AmerisourceBergen Corporation (through its operating subsidiaries, including AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation); Cardinal Health, Inc. (through its operating affiliates); and McKesson Corporation. I cannot seem to find copies of those agreements in the record. Please file these agreements on ECF immediately.Thank you all for your prompt response to this inquiry. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/30/2020) (js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Astrazeneca PLC for Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited..(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited..(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/24/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION: 1. The Complaint filed in this action on June 11, 2020 shall be deemed to have been served on all Defendants as of the date this Stipulation is approved and entered by the Court. 2. Except as to service of process, in joining this Stipulation, Defendants do not thereby waive, and expressly reserve, all objections and defenses to these actions, including without limitation any objections and defenses as to personal jurisdiction and venue. 3. This action is hereby consolidated as a member case to the J.M. Smith case, Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-7233. 4. The pending motions to dismiss or transfer, oppositions thereto, reply briefs, and documents submitted in support thereof filed in the Walgreen and CVS actions I shall be deemed to have been filed in this action, mutatis mutandis, and the Court's ruling on those motions shall be deemed to apply to this action. The parties shall retain all appellate rights they would have if the motions and oppositions were refiled in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/24/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20217912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20217912. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-10049. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-07233. Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Accord Healthcare Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20217641)Document filed by Hy-Vee, Inc...(Perwin, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca LP
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: Peter M. Boyle
Represented By: Christina E. Fahmy
Represented By: Thomas J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: J. Clayton Athey
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Anna T. Neill
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Represented By: Jason Wayne Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?