A.S. v. State of Delaware et al
Plaintiff: A.S.
Defendant: Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services, Richard Powell, Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families and State of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2020cv01091
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED re #9 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party State of Delaware, Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families and Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services terminated. Attorney Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan terminated as to the aforementioned Defendants. Claims against Defendant Richard Powell in his individual capacity remain. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/15/2020. (dlw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Claims by Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families, Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services, State of Delaware. (Wan, Kenneth) Modified on 10/15/2020 (dlw).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiff to file their answering brief in opposition to #4 motion to dismiss (Set Briefing Schedule: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Sovereign immunity - Answering Brief due 10/15/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/9/2020. (dlw)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION Allow Plaintiffs to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by October 15, 2020 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Sovereign immunity by A.S.. (Fletcher, William)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 Stipulation to Allow Defendants to File Partial Motion to Dismiss Out of Time. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/1/2020. (dlw)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION to Allow Defendants to File Partial Motion to Dismiss Out of Time by Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families, Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services, Richard Powell, State of Delaware. (Wan, Kenneth)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Partial Motion to Dismiss One Day Out of Time by Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families, Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services, Richard Powell, State of Delaware (Wan, Kenneth)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER re #3 MOTION for Leave to File Partial Motion to Dismiss One Day Out of Time - Defendants' motion to for leave to file is a nondispositive motion that, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, requires an averment of counsel that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with Plaintiff on this issue. THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before 9/3/2020, Defendants shall file the requisite Rule 7.1.1 Statement. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/27/2020. (dlw)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Sovereign immunity - filed by Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families, Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services, Richard Powell, State of Delaware. (Wan, Kenneth)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Partial Motion to Dismiss One Day Out of Time - filed by Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families, Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services, Richard Powell, State of Delaware. (Wan, Kenneth) Modified on 8/27/2020 (dlw).
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct., Case Number K20C-07-00035 WLW (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3140457)- filed by State of Delaware, Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services, Richard Powell, Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.S. v. State of Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Youth Rehabilitation Services
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Powell
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Services for Children, Youth & their Families
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Delaware
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Gary E. Junge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?