Webb v. May et al
Petitioner: William Joseph Webb, Jr.
Respondent: Warden Robert May and Kathleen Jennings
Case Number: 1:2020cv01092
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Joseph Webb, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(nmg) Modified on 10/6/2020 (nms).
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Joseph Webb, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(apk) Modified on 8/28/2020 (nms).
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings - filed by William Joseph Webb, Jr. (myr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (IFP Filed, No Fee paid). - filed by William Joseph Webb, Jr.(myr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by William Joseph Webb, Jr (myr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by William Joseph Webb, Jr. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Robert May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Joseph Webb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?