Bishop v. Ni et al
Plaintiff: Jim Bishop
Defendant: Zhehui Ni, Ren Hua Zheng, Caixuan Xu, Zhou Min Ni, Xiao Mou Zhang, Chan Sin Wong, Jian Ming Ni and Hong Wang
Nominal Defendant: HF Foods Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01103
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by HF Foods Group, Inc.. (Steadman, Anne)
September 8, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles W. Cox, John A. Jordak, Jr for HF Foods Group, Inc., for Jian Ming Ni, for Zhehui Ni, for Zhou Min Ni, for Hong Wang, for Chan Sin Wong, for Caixuan Xu, for Xiao Mou Zhang, and for Ren Hua Zheng added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
September 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Courtney E. Quiros for HF Foods Group, Inc. for Jian Ming Ni, for Zhehui Ni, for Zhou Min Ni, for Hong Wang, for Chan Sin Wong, for Caixuan Xu, for Xiao Mou Zhang,and for Ren Hua Zheng added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John A. Jordak, Jr., Charles W. Cox, and Courtney E. Quiros - filed by HF Foods Group, Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhehui Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Hong Wang, Chan Sin Wong, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang, Ren Hua Zheng. (Steadman, Anne)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of of Appearance of Bradley R. Aronstam and Anne M. Steadman by HF Foods Group, Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhehui Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Hong Wang, Chan Sin Wong, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang, Ren Hua Zheng (Steadman, Anne)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John A. Jordak, Jr., Charles W. Cox, and Courtney E. Quiros, filed by Chan Sin Wong, Hong Wang, Ren Hua Zheng, HF Foods Group, Inc., Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Zhehui Ni, Jian Ming Ni, Xiao Mou Zhang. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/3/2020. (nms)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Jim Bishop. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 8/28/2020 (nms).
August 26, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 4 has been removed from the docket. The exhibit filed at that entry has been added to the filing at D.I. #2 . (nms)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for leave to file Complaint under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a redacted, public version of the Complaint will be filed within seven (7) days of notice of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/21/2020. (nmg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Verification of Jim Bishop re #2 Complaint, by Jim Bishop. (nmg) Modified on 8/26/2020 (nms).
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against HF Foods Group, Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhehui Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Hong Wang, Chan Sin Wong, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang, Ren Hua Zheng - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3146374.) - filed by Jim Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2020: #2 Exhibit A) (nms).
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to file Complaint under seal - filed by Jim Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)
August 21, 2020 Remark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (nmg)
August 21, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
August 21, 2020 No Summons Issued. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Ni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhehui Ni
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ren Hua Zheng
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caixuan Xu
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhou Min Ni
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiao Mou Zhang
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chan Sin Wong
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Ming Ni
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Wang
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Bishop
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: HF Foods Group, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Anne M. Steadman
Represented By: Courtney E. Quiros
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?