Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Apotex Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.
Defendant: Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01105
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mary Swears for Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., for Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.: For Apotex Inc. waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.: For Apotex Corp. waiver sent on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Sipes, Jeffrey B. Elikan, Megan Keane, Jeremy Cobb, Laura Dolbow, and Mary Swears filed by Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe LTD. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/27/2020. (dlw)
August 27, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey B. Elikan for Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., for Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Sipes, Jeffrey B. Elikan, Megan Keane, Jeremy Cobb, Laura Dolbow, and Mary Swears - filed by Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (Attachments: #1 Summons- Apotex Corp)(sam)
August 24, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 7 deleted. Document was intended for a different case. (sam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (sam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: not earlier than 07/13/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/27/2023. (sam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,238,673 B2 ;10,047,117 B2 ;10,052,337 B2 ;10,174,073 B2. (sam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3146824.) - filed by Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Apotex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Mary K. Swears
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Elikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Mary K. Swears
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Elikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?