Baker v. Croda Inc.
Plaintiff: Catherine Baker
Defendant: Croda Inc. and Croda, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01108
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney T. Michael Morgan for Catherine Baker added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rene F. Rocha for Catherine Baker added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Frank M. Petosa for Catherine Baker added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Stephen A. Swedlow and Athena D. Dalton for Croda Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney T. Michael Morgan, Rene F. Rocha and Frank M. Petosa filed by Catherine Baker. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/15/2020. (dlw)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney T. Michael Morgan, Rene F. Rocha and Frank M. Petosa - filed by Catherine Baker. (McGee, Kyle)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Croda Investments, Inc. for Croda Inc. filed by Croda Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Christina Manuelli re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and for Failure to State a Claim, #8 Opening Brief in Support by Croda Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shen, Zi-Xiang) Modified on 10/14/2020 (dlw).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Croda Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2020. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) Modified on 10/14/2020 (dlw).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Croda Inc. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) Modified on 10/14/2020 (dlw).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marcio W. Valladares and Michael Ram for Catherine Baker added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marcio W. Valladares and Michael F. Ram - filed by Catherine Baker. (McGee, Kyle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen Swedlow and Athena Dalton - filed by Croda Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marcio W. Valladares and Michael F. Ram filed by Catherine Baker. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/18/2020. (dlw)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen Swedlow and Athena Dalton filed by Croda Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/18/2020. (dlw)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME time for Defendant to Answer Complaint to October 13, 2020 - filed by Croda Inc.. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, otherwise plead in response to the Complaint to October 13, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Croda Inc. answer due 10/13/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/2/2020. (dlw)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Baker. Croda Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (McGee, Kyle)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Croda Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3149606.) - filed by Catherine Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order No Summons Issued. (sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Croda Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Croda Inc.
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Represented By: Athena D. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Croda, Inc.
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Represented By: Athena D. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Baker
Represented By: Kyle John McGee
Represented By: Michael Ram
Represented By: Frank M. Petosa
Represented By: Marcio W. Valladares
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Represented By: Rene F. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?