DuBose et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thea DuBose and David DuBose
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01118
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/26/2021. (nmf)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/26/2021. (nmf)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying (14) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00436-CFC; denying (10) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-01118-CFC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/7/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00436-CFC, 1:20-cv-01118-CFC(nmf)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Letter from Sally Potts regarding Wyndham Club Resorts with attachments. (nmg)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re David DuBose, Thea DuBose: Entry of appearance of attorney Herbert W. Mondros. Attorney Herbert W. Mondros of the law firm Margolis Edelstein terminated. (Mondros, Herbert)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Herbert W. Mondros, Esquire regarding Motion to Consolidate filed by Plaintiffs, and the motions to dismiss filed by Defendant. (Mondros, Herbert)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by David DuBose, Thea DuBose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mondros, Herbert)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Denn, Matthew)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Denn, Matthew)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases - filed by David DuBose, Thea DuBose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Mondros, Herbert)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David DuBose, Thea DuBose.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mondros, Herbert)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (fms)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. for Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Denn, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 Opening Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Theresa A. Orben) by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Denn, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/6/2020. (Denn, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Denn, Matthew)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Szulczewski, Esquire filed by David DuBose, Thea DuBose, #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard B. Prossnitz, Esquire filed by David DuBose, Thea DuBose. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. (nmf)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard B. Prossnitz for David DuBose, for Thea DuBose added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam Szulczewski for David DuBose, for Thea DuBose added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Szulczewski, Esquire - filed by David DuBose, Thea DuBose. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Adam Szulczewski)(Mondros, Herbert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard B. Prossnitz, Esquire - filed by David DuBose, Thea DuBose. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Howard D. Prossnitz)(Mondros, Herbert)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3155654.) - filed by David DuBose, Thea DuBose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit H and I, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/27/2020) (myr). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/27/2020) (myr).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order No Summons Issued. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuBose et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thea DuBose
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Represented By: Howard B. Prossnitz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Represented By: Herbert W. Mondros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David DuBose
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Represented By: Howard B. Prossnitz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Represented By: Herbert W. Mondros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?