Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Westell Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: Westell Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01140
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/16/2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Westell Technologies, Inc. answer due 11/16/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/8/2020. (dlw)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to complaint to 11/16/2020 - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
October 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Stormborn Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01138-MN, 1:20-cv-01139-MN, 1:20-cv-01140-MN(kmd)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file response to Complaint to 10/17/20 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Westell Technologies, Inc. answer due 10/17/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/15/2020. (dlw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to 10/17/20 - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/3/2020. (dlw)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
September 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01138-MN, 1:20-cv-01139-MN, 1:20-cv-01140-MN (rjb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (apk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. RE44,199 E. (apk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Westell Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3160008.) - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 List of Related Cases)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Westell Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westell Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?