Werner v. Hive Media Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery R. Werner
Defendant: Hive Media Group, LLC and Kipzo, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01176
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce Bellingham filed by Jeffery R. Werner. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/13/20. (ntl)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Answer to Complaint to November 16, 2020 filed by Hive Media Group, LLC, Kipzo, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/13/20. (ntl)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Answer to Complaint to November 16, 2020 - filed by Hive Media Group, LLC, Kipzo, LLC. (Shandler, Chad)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffery R. Werner. All Parties. (Sharma, Aman)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce Bellingham - filed by Jeffery R. Werner. (Sharma, Aman)
September 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 3, 2020 No Summons Issued. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)Vau 1-276-595; Vau 1-253-880; VA 1-803-445; VA 1-917-856;. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Hive Media Group, LLC, Kipzo, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3175259.) - filed by Jeffery R. Werner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-28, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Werner v. Hive Media Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery R. Werner
Represented By: Aman Kaushik Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hive Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Chad Michael Shandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kipzo, LLC
Represented By: Chad Michael Shandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?