KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. v. AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP et al
Plaintiff: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. and Kinney Drugs, Inc.
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01201
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Plaintiffs to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/12/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/2/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
October 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Brett J. Williamson and Stephen J. McIntyre for Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(kmd)
October 12, 2020 Filing 74 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Michael Van Gorder regarding Joint Status Report - re #72 Status Report,. (Van Gorder, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Van Gorder on behalf of KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. (Van Gorder, Michael)
October 8, 2020 Filing 72 Joint STATUS REPORT AND STATEMENT OF PENDING MATTERS WHICH REQUIRE JUDICIAL ATTENTION by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (113 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC, 74 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 153 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 35 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 88 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
October 6, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP - filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Colette T. Connor for AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP and Astrazeneca UK Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: On or before October 8, 2020, the parties shall confer and file a single combined status report regarding the related cases. STATUS REPORT ORDER:( Status Report due by 10/8/2020.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
September 21, 2020 Filing 70 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Kimberly Marion Hennings. Marked as "Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward" (mal)
September 17, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 17, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 16, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Related Cases Informing The Court That This Action Relates To Other Actions Already Pending Before The Honorable Colm F. Connolly by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited (Silver, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor, filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/16/2020. (nms)
September 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited (Joyce, Alexandra)
September 10, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 9/16/2020 (nms).
September 10, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited (Silver, Daniel)
September 10, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited (Kelly, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 63 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/9/2020. (amf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 62 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:20-cv-01096. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
September 9, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Delaware. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT this action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/9/2020) (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 60 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #58 Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #58 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 DC Certificate of Good Standing).(Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #57 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931291. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit not notarized. Please re-file enitre motion and make sure your affidavit is notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 57 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20931291. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PHV Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit District of Columbia Cert. of Good Standing).(Schmidtlein, John) Modified on 7/31/2020 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #48 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class. . Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration with Exhibits).(Ford, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #48 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class. . Document filed by J M Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly Hennings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Certificate of Service).(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Marion Hennings on behalf of J M Smith Corporation..(Hennings, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #52 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #50 MOTION to Dismiss (Refiled). . Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 52 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Related Document Number: #50 ..(Connor, Colette) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #50 MOTION to Dismiss (Refiled). . Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss (Refiled). Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Colette Connor to RE-FILE Document #47 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document(s) linked to filing error. (db) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Colette Connor to RE-FILE Document #45 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint.. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Dianne M. Nast dated 07/10/2020 re: Response to Letter. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Nast, Dianne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class, #2 Declaration of Dianne M. Nast in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Dianne M. Nast as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Ford, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 47 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Connor, Colette) Modified on 7/13/2020 (db). [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #45 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Nast, Dianne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 45 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement memorandum in support, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order).(Connor, Colette) Modified on 7/13/2020 (db). [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #36 Motion for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #37 Motion for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #40 Motion for Colette T.Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Stephanie Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Sarah E. DeLoach to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #22 Motion for Michael David Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/13/2020). (mde) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Lewis A. Kaplan is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 43 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 42 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Handa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Marino, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Marino on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Marino, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19443743. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19443743. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit District of Columbia Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Virginia Cert. of Good Standing).(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Astrazeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Document filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited..(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited..(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19377541. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #37 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19377830. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19377830. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(McIntyre, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19377541. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Bradshaw, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Roda, Joseph) Modified on 3/31/2020 (ad). Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19183733 [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Schock on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Schock, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Wall, Carolyn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Williamson, Brett) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Dianne M Nast to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan)(Text Only Order) (Kaplan, Lewis) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Dianne M. Nast to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19225041. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Dianne M. Nast to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19225041. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Nast, Dianne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca UK Limited waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca LP waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #23 MOTION for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19183733. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California (Copy and paste this link) https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/pdf/Attorney/certificate-of-good-standing-contact-list.pdf ;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Joseph N. Roda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19183733. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Roda, Joseph) Modified on 3/22/2020 (ad). Modified on 3/22/2020 (ad). [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Michael David Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19142435. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Michael David Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19142435. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Ford, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 21 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-07233. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 MOTION for Michael L. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/2/2020) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 27, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Michael L. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18940605. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Michael L. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18940605. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Roberts, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/26/2020) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca UK Limited..(dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP..(dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca LP..(dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 MOTION for Karen Sharp Halbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/12/2020) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca UK Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephanie Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephanie Smith. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code St. Lawrence. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Karen Sharp Halbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18745132. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Karen Sharp Halbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18745132. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit AR Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Halbert, Karen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Sarah E. DeLoach to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18744970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Sarah E. DeLoach to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18744970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Sarah E. DeLoach to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18744970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit AR Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(DeLoach, Sarah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Stephanie Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18733578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Stephanie Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18733578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18733386)Document filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. a/k/a Kinney Drugs, Inc...(Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. v. AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinney Drugs, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Colette T. Connor
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca LP
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Colette T. Connor
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Colette T. Connor
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Brett J. Williamson
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Stephen J. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?