DivX, LLC v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DivX, LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and Realtek Semiconductor Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01202
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall to hear and resolve all pretrial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, or pre-trial motions in limine ). The above caption shall be used in all subsequent filings in this case. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01202-CFC, 1:20-cv-01203-CFC(nmf)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit for the mailing of process to Realtek Semiconductor Corp. (amf)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION re #8 Praecipe of Rosemary J. Piergiovanni by DivX, LLC. (Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 PRAECIPE filed by Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni on behalf of DivX, LLC requesting Clerk to issue Rule 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) service on Realtek Semiconductor Corporation (Piergiovanni, Rosemary)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for LG Defendants to respond to the Complaint to 12/30/2020 filed by DivX, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: LG Electronics Inc. answer due 12/30/2020; LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 12/30/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/1/2020. (nmf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for LG Defendants to respond to the Complaint to 12/30/2020 - filed by DivX, LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
September 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01202-CFC, 1:20-cv-01203-CFC (rjb)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DivX, LLC. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Farnan, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent DivX CF Investors LLC for DivX, LLC filed by DivX, LLC. (mal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,832,297 B2 ;US 10,212,486 B2 ;US 10,412,141 B2 ;US 10,484,749 B2. (mal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Realtek Semiconductor Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3188311.) - filed by DivX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DivX, LLC v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realtek Semiconductor Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DivX, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?