Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Transit U, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: David T. Hastings, Christine D. Hastings, National Indemnity Company, David O. Hastings, Thomas Dowd, Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC, Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC, William Hastings, Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC and Transit U, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01216
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #26 MOTION for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Thomas Dowd answer due 11/16/2020; Christine D. Hastings answer due 11/16/2020; David O. Hastings answer due 11/16/2020; David T. Hastings answer due 11/16/2020; William Hastings answer due 11/16/2020; Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC answer due 11/16/2020; Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC answer due 11/16/2020; Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC answer due 11/16/2020; Transit U, Inc. answer due 11/16/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/20/2020. (nms)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCullough, Bruce) Modified on 10/19/2020 (nms).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re #26 MOTION for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/19/2020. (nms)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Thomas Dowd, Christine D. Hastings, David O. Hastings, David T. Hastings, Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC, Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC, Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC, Transit U, Inc.. (Bennett, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint - filed by Thomas Dowd, Christine D. Hastings, David O. Hastings, David T. Hastings, Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC, Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC, Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC, Transit U, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 7.1.1 Statement)(Bennett, Daniel) Modified on 10/5/2020 (nms).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Remark: DI 27 deleted per counsels request. (apk)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Remark: DI 26 Deleted per counsels request. (apk)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Thomas Dowd served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. David T. Hastings served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. William Hastings served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Christine D. Hastings served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. David O. Hastings served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Transit U, Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (McCullough, Bruce)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Bennett on behalf of Thomas Dowd, Christine D. Hastings, David O. Hastings, David T. Hastings, William Hastings, Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC, Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC, Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC, Transit U, Inc. (Bennett, Daniel)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: (nms)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The summons returned executed at D.I. 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, and 15 have been removed from the docket as the incorrect service date was used for all filings. Counsel is to refile the executed summons using the correct service dates. (nms)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Kaufmann - filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(McCullough, Bruce)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew N. Klebanoff - filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(McCullough, Bruce)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald P. Schiller - filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(McCullough, Bruce)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald P. Schiller, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Kaufmann, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, and #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew N. Klebanoff, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/17/2020. (nms)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Ronald P. Schiller, Matthew N. Klebanoff, Daniel P. Kaufmann for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company, Ltd. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company - filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (kmd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Thomas Dowd, Christine D. Hastings, David O. Hastings, David T. Hastings, William Hastings, Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC, Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC, Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC, National Indemnity Company, Transit U, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3193271.) - filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Thomas Dowd on 9/11/2020; Christine D. Hastings on 9/11/2020; David O. Hastings on 9/11/2020; David T. Hastings on 9/11/2020; William Hastings on 9/11/2020; Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC on 9/11/2020; Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC on 9/11/2020; Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC on 9/11/2020; National Indemnity Company on 9/11/2020; Transit U, Inc. on 9/11/2020. (kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Transit U, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Hastings
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine D. Hastings
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O. Hastings
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dowd
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolly Trolley Transportation Service, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolly Trolley Limousine Service, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hastings
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolly Trolley School Bus, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transit U, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce W. McCullough
Represented By: Daniel P. Kaufmann
Represented By: Ronald P. Schiller
Represented By: Matthew N. Klebanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?