AuroMedics Pharma LLC et al v. Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Plaintiff: AuroMedics Pharma LLC and SciDose LLC
Counter Claimant: Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01235
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 62 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,662,342. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(kmd)
October 13, 2021 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #61 . (kmd)
October 8, 2021 Filing 61 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Fineman, Steven)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SO ORDERED, #59 Stipulation and Order to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. (*Reset Deadlines for Claim Construction Briefing: Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 10/7/2021; Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 10/21/2021; Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 10/22/2021; Markman Hearing date and time shall remain the same). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 9/23/2021. (ceg)
September 20, 2021 Filing 59 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Scheduling Order Deadlines to Various Dates - filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Fineman, Steven)
September 9, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Belgam, Neal)
August 20, 2021 Filing 57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines to Various Dates - filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Fineman, Steven)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #57 Stipulation to Extend Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines. (*Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2021; Joinder of Parties due by 10/28/2021; Substantial Completion of Document Production by 9/30/2021). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/20/2021. (ceg)
August 13, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.(Fineman, Steven)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' July 30, 2021 letter, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall defer any indefiniteness issues until later in the case, i.e., the Court will not entertain indefiniteness arguments at claim construction. The terms "substantially nonaqueous" and "extended stability" will not be construed at the claim construction hearing. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/5/2021. (ceg)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (D.I. #51 ) denying #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/5/2021. (fms)
July 30, 2021 Filing 53 Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Steven J. Fineman regarding Defendant's proposal to construe the terms "extended stability" and "substantially non-aqueous" as indefinite during claim construction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fineman, Steven)
July 29, 2021 Filing 52 CLAIM Construction Chart by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Fineman, Steven)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #49 Joint Stipulation to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. (*Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2021; Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2021). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/22/2021. (ceg)
July 20, 2021 Filing 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. (*Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2021). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/20/2021. (ceg)
July 16, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Claim Terms Needing Construction and Proposed Constructions filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Belgam, Neal)
July 15, 2021 Filing 49 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings to September 30, 2021 - filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Fineman, Steven)
July 1, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Miller, Jason)
June 21, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs AuroMedics Pharma LLC and SciDose LLC's Responses to First Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.(Moyer, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs AuroMedics Pharma LLC and SciDose LLC's Disclosures of Initial Claim Chart filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.(Moyer, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-69) filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Miller, Jason)
May 7, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's ESI Disclosures filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.(Fineman, Steven)
May 7, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Miller, Jason)
May 3, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff SciDose LLC's Initial Identification of Trade Secrets filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.(Caras, Valerie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #39 Stipulation and Order to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. (*Initial identification of trade secrets due 5/3/2021; Production of core technical document due 5/10/2021). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/30/2021. (ceg)
April 28, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Miller, Jason)
April 28, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.(Fineman, Steven)
April 28, 2021 Filing 39 STIPULATION and [Proposed]Order to Extend Scheduling Deadlines by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Fineman, Steven)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SO ORDERED, #35 Stipulation and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/26/2021. (ceg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 37 ORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Should any party (or all parties) desire to discuss mediation and its timing, the party(ies) shall contact Judge Thynge and her Law Clerk, Daniel Taylor (#daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov), to request that a teleconference be scheduled. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/23/2021. (Taylor, Daniel)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 7/15/2021. Fact Discovery completed by 2/17/2022. Opening Expert Reports due by 3/17/2022. Status Report due by 12/9/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2022. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 10/12/2021. A Markman Hearing is set for 11/2/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2022. A Pretrial Conference is set for 10/20/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 11/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. (*See Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/23/2021. (ceg)
April 23, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (Taylor, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER and Stipulation re Protective Order by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Miller, Jason)
April 14, 2021 Filing 34 Letter to Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Steven J. Fineman regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Fineman, Steven)
April 14, 2021 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Scheduling by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Fineman, Steven)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, as discussed at the scheduling conference, on or before April 14, 2021, the parties shall submit either a revised scheduling order or a letter advising the Court of their preferred trial date. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/7/2021. (ceg)
April 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Hall - Motion Hearing held by video conference on 4/7/2021 re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (*Court Reporter Jennifer Guy) (ceg)
April 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Hall - Scheduling Conference held by video conference on 4/7/2021. (*Court Reporter Jennifer Guy) (ceg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-113) and Defendant Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Miller, Jason)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORAL ORDER: A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will take place following the motion hearing scheduled for April 7, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/2/2021. (ceg)
February 12, 2021 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Scheduling Order by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Fineman, Steven)
February 12, 2021 Filing 28 Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Steven J. Fineman regarding January 13, 2021 Scheduling Order - re 20 Oral Order,,,,. (Fineman, Steven)
February 11, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.(Fineman, Steven)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORAL ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: A hearing on the pending Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter (D.I. #13 ) is scheduled for April 7, 2021 at 2:00 PM via video conference before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Each side will be allocated 15 minutes for argument. The parties shall send a joint email to Cailah_Garfinkel@ded.uscourts.gov containing the following information regarding oral argument on or before April 5, 2021: (1) a video conference link with instructions on how to join the conference; (2) a separate audio-only dial-in; and (3) a list of attendees for each party, specifying who will be presenting argument. Any slide presentations or demonstratives that the parties wish to use during the hearing shall be emailed to Cailah_Garfinkel@ded.uscourts.gov no later than 24 hours prior to the hearing. Slide presentations or demonstratives may be presented by the parties on the video conference screen or referred to by the parties at the hearing. Once the dial-in information is received by the Court, members of the public may obtain it by contacting Chambers at Cailah_Garfinkel@ded.uscourts.gov. All participants (including any media and members of the public) are reminded that recording or broadcasting proceedings is STRICTLY PROHIBITED. All participants shall be present on the video conference no later than 10 minutes prior to the start of the hearing. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/4/2021. (ceg)
February 2, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Belgam, Neal)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #24 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss to February 3, 2021 filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, (*Reset Briefing Schedule: Reply Brief due 2/3/2021). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/2/2021. (ceg)
February 1, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss to February 3, 2021 - filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Miller, Jason)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #23 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to File its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss to February 2, 2021 (*Reset Briefing Schedule: Reply Brief due 2/2/2021). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/27/2021. (ceg)
January 26, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Defendant to File its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss to February 2, 2021 - filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Miller, Jason)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The so ordered by Judge Connolly re D.I. #23 has been removed from the docket as it was entered in error. (fms)
January 22, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Caras, Valerie)
January 22, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim [Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Counterclaims] by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC.(Fineman, Steven)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty days, the parties shall jointly prepare and file the following: (i) a proposed Scheduling Order consistent with Judge Hall's "Rule 16 Scheduling Order - Patent" up through and including paragraph number 15 (i.e., up to but not including case dispositive motions) and consistent with paragraphs 20-26 of Judge Connolly's "Patent Case Scheduling Order In Cases Where Infringement is Alleged "; and (ii) a letter, not to exceed three pages, setting forth (a) a description of what this case is about; (b) the parties' positions regarding any disputes in the proposed Scheduling Order; and (c) a list of any other issues the parties want to address at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Thereafter, the Court may schedule a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to be held with Judge Hall. The Scheduling Orders can be found on Judge Hall's and Judge Connolly's portions of the District Court's website. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/13/2021. (ceg)
January 5, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Yi Sun and Sarah W. Wang for AuroMedics Pharma LLC and SciDose LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 Joint Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Neal C. Belgam and Jeffrey L. Moyer regarding Regarding Your Honor's Order of December 21, 2020 (D.I. 17) - re #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 17 Order, #1 Complaint,. (Belgam, Neal)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel G. Brown, Jennifer L. Barry, Jennifer Koh, Yi Sun and Sarah W. Wang filed by SciDose LLC, AuroMedics Pharma LLC. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/4/2021. (ceg)
December 31, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel G. Brown, Jennifer L. Barry, Jennifer Koh, Yi Sun and Sarah W. Wang - filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(Fineman, Steven)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, on or before January 4, 2021, the parties shall file a joint letter advising the Court as to whether it would be appropriate to enter a scheduling order at this time or whether there is good cause not to do so. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/21/2020. (ceg)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #16 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to move, answer or otherwise respond to Defendant's Counterclaims and for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to January 22, 2021 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: AuroMedics Pharma LLC answer due 1/22/2021, SciDose LLC answer due 1/22/2021. *Reset Briefing Schedule: re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - Answering Brief due 1/22/2021). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/21/2020. (ceg)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The so ordered of D.I. #16 on 12/18/2020 by Judge Connolly has been removed from the docket as it has been docketed in this case in error. (fms)
December 17, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to move, answer or otherwise respond to Defendant's Counterclaims and for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Opening Brief in Support thereof to January 22, 2021 - filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Fineman, Steven)
December 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael R. Dzwonczyk for Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Dzwonczyk filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/11/2020. (ceg)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Dzwonczyk - filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(Miller, Jason)
December 8, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document at DI# 13 has been replaced per counsel's request. (cna, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Belgam, Neal)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belgam, Neal) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/8/2020) (cna, ).
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC Partial Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Belgam, Neal)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Julie M. O'Dell. Attorney Eve H. Ormerod terminated. (O'Dell, Julie)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall to hear and resolve all pretrial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, or pre-trial motions in limine.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/30/2020. (nmf)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to plaintiff's complaint to December 7, 2020 filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 12/7/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/30/2020. (nmf)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to plaintiff's complaint to December 7, 2020 - filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Ormerod, Eve)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to November 9, 2020 filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 11/9/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/25/2020. (fms)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to November 9, 2020 - filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Ormerod, Eve)
September 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Caras, Valerie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. for AuroMedics Pharma LLC filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC. (mal)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by SciDose LLC. (mal)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,662,342. (mal)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3203957.) - filed by AuroMedics Pharma LLC, SciDose LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AuroMedics Pharma LLC et al v. Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AuroMedics Pharma LLC
Represented By: Valerie A. Caras
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Yi Sun
Represented By: Sarah W. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SciDose LLC
Represented By: Valerie A. Caras
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Sarah W. Wang
Represented By: Yi Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?