Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Lupin Limited et al
Plaintiff: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. and H. Lundbeck A/S
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv01296
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by H. Lundbeck A/S, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Balick, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aryeh N. Feinstein for Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01988-LPS, 1:20-cv-01296-LPS(kmd)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aryeh N. Feinstein filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/6/20. (ntl)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aryeh N. Feinstein - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Aryeh N. Feinstein)(Bilson, David)
November 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William R. Zimmerman,Carol M. Pitzel Cruz for Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman and Carol Pitzel Cruz filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/2/20. (ntl)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman and Carol Pitzel Cruz - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William R. Zimmerman, #2 Certification of Carol Pitzel Cruz)(Bilson, David)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent no parent corporation for Lupin Limited; Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against H. Lundbeck A/S, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Limited.(Phillips, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION Regarding Waivers of Service and Establishment of Answer Deadlines filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/13/20. (ntl)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION Regarding Waivers of Service and Establishment of Answer Deadlines, by H. Lundbeck A/S, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Balick, Steven)
September 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01286-LPS, 1:20-cv-01287-LPS, 1:20-cv-01295-LPS, 1:20-cv-01296-LPS, 1:20-cv-01297-LPS (rjb)
September 28, 2020 No Summons Issued. (sam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd. for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (sam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by H. Lundbeck A/S. (sam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: August 13, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/10/2023. (sam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE48,059. (sam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT- filed against Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3225786.) - filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Lupin Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: Aryeh N. Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Represented By: Aryeh N. Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Lundbeck A/S
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?