Harmony Licensing LLC v. MVG, Inc.
Plaintiff: Harmony Licensing LLC
Defendant: MVG, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01320
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/19/20. (ntl)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harmony Licensing LLC as to MVG, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to complaint to 11/20/2020 filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/21/20. (ntl)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to complaint to 11/20/2020 - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
October 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Harmony Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01318-LPS, 1:20-cv-01319-LPS, 1:20-cv-01320-LPS(kmd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:20-cv-01319-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, (6 in 1:20-cv-01320-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC, (6 in 1:20-cv-01318-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/9/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01318-LPS, 1:20-cv-01319-LPS, 1:20-cv-01320-LPS (ntl)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harmony Licensing LLC. MVG, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
October 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01318-LPS, 1:20-cv-01319-LPS, 1:20-cv-01320-LPS (rjb)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (amf)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE42,219. (amf)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against MVG, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3232437) - filed by Harmony Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmony Licensing LLC v. MVG, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVG, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harmony Licensing LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: Andrew S. Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?