Smith v. Boeing Company as Successor To Mcdonnell Douglas et al
Plaintiff: Donzetta Smith
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc., CBS Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Alliedsignal, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Westinghouse Electric Corp., Pratt & Whitney, ViaCom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., A Pennsylvania Corp., General Electric Company, Boeing Company as Successor To Mcdonnell Douglas, Ingersoll-Rand Company, The Bendix Corporation, Northrop-Grumman Corporation, Crane Co., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and Pneumo Abex LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01322
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts schedule, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling teleconference previously set in this matter for 12/14/2020 is RESCHEDULED to 1/6/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 12/30/2020. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/13/2020. (lih)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 12/14/2020 at 11:00 a.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 12/9/2020. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/9/2020. (lih)
November 5, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by United Technologies Corporation. (Adams, William) Modified on 11/5/2020 (lih).
November 5, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the answer previously filed as D.I. 24 due to the document being filed using the incorrect event code. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-NOTICE OF REMOVAL event code and not the answer to complaint event code. (lih)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. regarding Service of the Complaint, Defendants' Answers, and R.16 Conference. (Hrubiec, R.)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/22/2020. (lih)
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean R. Roland on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Roland, Dean)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International, Inc. filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Reese, C.)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc. for CBS Corporation filed by CBS Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Texter on behalf of CBS Corporation (Texter, Allison)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis C. Gondek on behalf of Crane Co. (Gondek, Francis)
October 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
October 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Northrop-Grumman Corporation. (Rappaport, Nancy)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation's Answer with Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, & Reply to Cross-Claims to Plaintiff's Complaint), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Northrop-Grumman Corporation.(Rappaport, Nancy)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 JOINDER by Honeywell International, Inc., joining in #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Florax, Joelle)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Larson, William)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bruce Larson, Jr on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Larson, William)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #6 Joinder to Notice of Removal, Exhibit "A" by Northrop-Grumman Corporation. (Rappaport, Nancy)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 JOINDER by Northrop-Grumman Corporation, joining in #1 Notice of Removal, with Certificate of Service. (Rappaport, Nancy)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Boeing Company as Successor To Mcdonnell Douglas. (Bell, Tye)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 JOINDER by Boeing Company as Successor To Mcdonnell Douglas, joining in #1 Notice of Removal, . (Bell, Tye)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by United Technologies Corporation. (myr)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N20C-06-016 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3234062)- filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Defendant Raytheon Technologies Corporation's Statement to Local Rule 81.2)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Boeing Company as Successor To Mcdonnell Douglas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Smith
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: William R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliedsignal, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Smith
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney
Represented By: William R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViaCom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., A Pennsylvania Corp.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company as Successor To Mcdonnell Douglas
Represented By: Tye C. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Smith
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop-Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Nancy Shane Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donzetta Smith
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?